EP0685323 - Method for laying-up of cut-to-length, spliced to a semi endless state tread material on a belt building drum [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/49] | Method and apparatus for laying-up of cut-to-length, spliced to a semi endless state tread material on a belt building drum | ||
[1997/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.1998 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [1997/52] |
Former [1995/49] | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 D-30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerloff, Klaus Tischbeinstrasse 5 D-30916 Isernhagen / DE | [1995/49] | Application number, filing date | 95108071.2 | 26.05.1995 | [1995/49] | Priority number, date | DE19944419645 | 04.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4419645 | [1995/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0685323 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0685323 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/30 | [1995/49] | CPC: |
B29D30/3007 (EP,US);
B29D30/30 (KR);
B29D30/08 (KR);
B29D30/58 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1079 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Auflegen der an einer Gürtelaufbautrommel benötigten Länge aus vorabgelängtem, zu quasi endlos gespleisstem Laufstreifenmaterial | [1997/52] | English: | Method for laying-up of cut-to-length, spliced to a semi endless state tread material on a belt building drum | [1997/52] | French: | Procédé pour la mise en place dans un tambour de ceinture, d'une longueur de bande de roulement précoupée et épissée de façon semi-continue | [1997/52] |
Former [1995/49] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Auflegen der an einer Gürtelaufbautrommel benötigten Länge aus vorabgelängtem, zu quasi endlos gespleisstem Laufstreifenmaterial | ||
Former [1995/49] | Method and apparatus for laying-up of cut-to-length, spliced to a semi endless state tread material on a belt building drum | ||
Former [1995/49] | Procédé et dispositif pour la mise en place dans un tambour de ceinture, d'une longueur de bande de roulement précoupée et épissée de façon semi-continue | Examination procedure | 07.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 07.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3917941 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE2846006 (KRUPP GMBH) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US4729521 (KUBO MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 7, line 60 - column 8, line 68 * |