EP0688619 - Strip casting apparatus with electromagnetic confining dam [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1999 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2000 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INLAND STEEL COMPANY 30 West Monroe Street Chicago, IL 60603 / US | [1995/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerber, Howard L. 175 North Harbor Drive Chicago, Illinois 60601 / US | 02 /
Saucedo, Ismael G. 371 Devon Court, Shorewood Forest Valparaiso, Indiana 46383 / US | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Leach, John N., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | Leach, John Nigel, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95108138.9 | 26.05.1995 | [1995/52] | Priority number, date | US19940263874 | 22.06.1994 Original published format: US 263874 | [1995/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0688619 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0688619 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | [1997/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0688619 | Date: | 20.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/06, B22D11/10 | [1995/52] | CPC: |
B22D11/0662 (EP,KR,US);
B22D11/0622 (KR);
B22D11/0682 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1995/52] | Title | German: | Giessbandvorrichtung mit elektromagnetischem begrenzenden Seitendamm | [1998/23] | English: | Strip casting apparatus with electromagnetic confining dam | [1995/52] | French: | Dispositif pour couler une bande contenant une petite face de confinement électromagnétique | [1995/52] |
Former [1995/52] | Giessbandmaschine mit elektromagnetischem begrenzenden Seitendamm | Examination procedure | 06.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/15] | 27.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98109378.4 / EP0867243 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 21.04.1999 | [2000/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0511550 (SVILUPPO MATERIALI SPA [IT]) [A] 1,60-65 * figure 1; claims 1-4 *; | [YDA]US5197534 (GERBER HOWARD L [US], et al) [YD] 1-6,8-15,18,19,24-34 * whole document * [A] 35-65; | [AD]US5251685 (PRAEG WALTER F [US]) [AD] 36-59* figures 1-6; claims 1-24 *; | [Y]US5279350 (GERBER HOWARD L [US]) [Y] 1-6,8-15,18,19,24-34 * column 10, line 26 - column 12, line 66; figures 1,16,18 *; | [A]DE4307850 (USINOR SACILOR PUTEAUX [FR], et al) [A] 1,36,60,63 * page 1 - page 2; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | US4936374 | US4974661 | US5197534 | US5251685 | US5279350 |