EP0689307 - A digital broadcasting system and a receiver to be used in the system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOKIA TECHNOLOGY GmbH Rensingstrasse 15 44807 Bochum / DE | [2002/24] |
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states NOKIA TECHNOLOGY GmbH Postfach 10 18 23 44718 Bochum / DE | ||
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states NOKIA TECHNOLOGY GmbH Östliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 132 D-75175 Pforzheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erkkilä, Vesa Kilonkallio 10 B 11 FIN-02610 Espoo / FI | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo, et al Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | Kupiainen, Juhani Kalervo, et al Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2000/27] | Stendel, Klaus, et al Nokia GmbH, Patentabteilung, Postfach 101823 44718 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 95108197.5 | 30.05.1995 | [1995/52] | Priority number, date | FI19940002875 | 16.06.1994 Original published format: FI 942875 | [1995/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0689307 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0689307 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04H1/00 | [1995/52] | CPC: |
H04H20/26 (EP);
H04H40/27 (EP);
H04L27/2657 (EP);
H04H20/18 (EP);
H04H20/22 (EP);
H04H20/72 (EP);
H04H2201/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1995/52] | Title | German: | Digitales Rundfunksystem und Empfänger zur Anwendung darin | [1995/52] | English: | A digital broadcasting system and a receiver to be used in the system | [1995/52] | French: | Système de radiodiffusion numérique et récepteur pour un tel système | [1995/52] | Examination procedure | 11.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/11] | 01.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 16.10.2002 | [2003/30] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3831095 (MOUNCE G) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 37; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9309615 (TELEFUNKEN FERNSEH & RUNDFUNK [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 25 - page 9, line 20; figures 1A,1B,4; claims 1,2,4 * | [Y] - G. PLENGE, "DAB, A new sound broadcasting system, Status of the development, Routes to its introduction", EBU REVIEW TECHNICAL, BRUSSELS, BE, no. 246, pages 87 - 112, XP000219708 [Y] 1 * page 107, column 1, line 20 - page 109, column 2, line 19 * | [A] - "Official EBU Technical Texts, EBU Expectations for first generation consumer DAB receivers.", EBU REVIEW TECHNICAL, BRUSSELS, BE, no. 255, pages 57 - 63 [A] 1 * page 58, line 15 - line 20 * |