blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0687114

EP0687114 - Apparatus for providing audible instructions or status information for use in a digital television system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.10.2001Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 12.12.2001 [2001/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC.
10330 North Meridian St.
Indianapolis, IN 46206 / US
[1995/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Hailey, James Edwin, Sr.
7239 Creekside Lane
Indianapolis, IN / US
02 / Virag, David Emery
9308A Viking Hills Court
Indianapolis, IN / US
[1995/50]
Representative(s)Wördemann, Hermes
Deutsche Thomson OHG
European Patent Operations
Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74
30625 Hannover / DE
[N/P]
Former [1995/50]Wördemann, Hermes, Dipl.-Ing.
Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Patent Dept., Göttinger Chaussee 76
D-30453 Hannover / DE
Application number, filing date95108288.231.05.1995
[1995/50]
Priority number, dateUS1994025732009.06.1994         Original published format: US 257320
[1995/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0687114
Date:13.12.1995
Language:EN
[1995/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0687114
Date:26.02.1997
[1997/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0687114
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.1997
ClassificationIPC:H04N5/44, H04N7/20, H01Q1/12
[1997/04]
CPC:
H04N5/602 (EP,US); H04N5/455 (KR); H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N21/4331 (EP,US); H04N21/4341 (EP,US); H04N21/4882 (EP,US);
H04N21/8106 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1995/50]H04N7/52
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [1995/50]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung von hörbaren Befehlen oder Zustandsinformationen in einem digitalen Fernsehsystem[1995/50]
English:Apparatus for providing audible instructions or status information for use in a digital television system[1995/50]
French:Appareil pour fournir des instructions audibles ou des informations d'état dans un système de télévision numérique[1995/50]
Examination procedure28.06.1997Examination requested  [1997/35]
23.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.10.1999Fee for grant paid
12.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.04.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
17.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIE31.05.2000
[2001/50]
Documents cited:Search[A]JPS60250733  ;
 [A]DE3723114  (DEUTSCHE BUNDESPOST [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 24; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4893288  (MAIER GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1,4-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 34 - line 65; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]WO9216071  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * page 5, line 1 - line 29 * * page 7, line 32 - page 12, line 32; figure 1 *;
 [E]EP0687029  (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [E] 1,2,4,5* the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860502), vol. 010, no. 117, Database accession no. (E - 400), & JP60250733 A 19851211 (SONY KK) [A] 1,4 * abstract *
by applicantUS19940232789
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.