EP0686478 - Lined metal article and method for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pirchl, Gerhard Seestrasse 341 5708 Birrwil / CH | [2000/01] |
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states Pirchl, Gerhard Seestrasse 341 CH-5708 Birrwil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/50] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | Riebling, Peter, Dr.-Ing., Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 D-88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 95108581.0 | 05.06.1995 | [1995/50] | Priority number, date | DE19944419994 | 08.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4419994 | [1995/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0686478 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0686478 | Date: | 05.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B29C63/04, B32B7/08, B32B15/14 | [1995/50] | CPC: |
B32B15/14 (EP,US);
B29C63/04 (EP,US);
B32B3/02 (US);
B32B3/266 (US);
B32B3/28 (US);
B29L2031/3014 (EP,US);
B32B2605/08 (US);
Y10T29/49908 (EP,US);
Y10T428/23 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/50] | Title | German: | Metallteil mit Kaschierung und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines solchen | [1995/50] | English: | Lined metal article and method for its manufacture | [1995/50] | French: | Pièce métallique doublée et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1995/50] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 08.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 05.01.2000 | GR | 05.01.2000 | NL | 05.01.2000 | SE | 05.01.2000 | DK | 05.04.2000 | PT | 05.04.2000 | AT | 05.06.2000 | LU | 05.06.2000 | BE | 30.06.2000 | MC | 30.06.2000 | [2005/23] |
Former [2004/07] | ES | 05.01.2000 | |
GR | 05.01.2000 | ||
NL | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
DK | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
AT | 05.06.2000 | ||
BE | 30.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | ES | 05.01.2000 | |
NL | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
DK | 05.04.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
AT | 05.06.2000 | ||
BE | 30.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | ES | 05.01.2000 | |
NL | 05.01.2000 | ||
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
AT | 05.06.2000 | ||
BE | 30.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | ES | 05.01.2000 | |
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
AT | 05.06.2000 | ||
BE | 30.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 05.01.2000 | |
SE | 05.01.2000 | ||
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
AT | 05.06.2000 | ||
BE | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | SE | 05.01.2000 | |
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
AT | 05.06.2000 | ||
BE | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/14] | PT | 05.04.2000 | |
AT | 05.06.2000 | ||
BE | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/22] | IE | 05.01.2000 | |
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
BE | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | IE | 05.01.2000 | |
PT | 05.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | PT | 05.04.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2176743 (COLAMCO INC) [X] 1 * page 1, lines 93-105 - page 2, lines 1-7; figures 4,5; claims 1,2,12,14 *; | [A]DE3808851 (SCHMIDT GMBH R [DE]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]EP0500202 (LIGNOTOCK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4 * column 7, line 43 - column 8, line 12; figure 5; claims 1,7 * * column 1, lines 1-27 *; | [PX]EP0603498 (ROEDER & SPENGLER STANZ [DE]) [PX] 2 * column 11, line 52 - column 12, line 52; figures 20-24,26 *; | [PA]DE4305189 (ANTON HUBER GMBH & CO GERAETE [DE]) [PA] * the whole document *; | [PA]DE4401903 (PEGUFORM WERKE GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1,4 * column 4, lines 58-65 - column 5, lines 54-67; figures 1,3,5,6; claim 1 * |