EP0687946 - Process for making photographic copies and photographic copying apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2001/40] |
Former [1995/51] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Benker, Gerhard Ichoring 32c D-82057 Icking / DE | 02 /
Treiber, Helmut, Dr. Rehbergstr. 8a D-81479 München / DE | 03 /
Klüter, Ulrich, Dr. Hanfstaenglstr. 20 D-80638 München / DE | 04 /
Lorenz, Bernhard Am Waldrand 58 D-85354 Freising / DE | 05 /
Münch, Reimund, Dr. Oertlinweg 7 D-81543 München / DE | [1995/51] | Application number, filing date | 95108594.3 | 06.06.1995 | [1995/51] | Priority number, date | DE19944420823 | 15.06.1994 Original published format: DE 4420823 | [1995/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0687946 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0687946 | Date: | 04.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G03B27/46, G03B27/47 | [1995/51] | CPC: |
G03B27/47 (EP,US);
G03B27/46 (EP,US);
G03B2227/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1995/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erstellen von fotografischen Kopien und fotografisches Kopiergerät | [1995/51] | English: | Process for making photographic copies and photographic copying apparatus | [1995/51] | French: | Procédé pour la production de copies photographiques et appareil photographique de copiage | [1995/51] | Examination procedure | 15.11.1995 | Examination requested [1996/02] | 22.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.06.2002 | [2008/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0567166 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,12 * column 12, line 18 - line 19; figures 1,10 * * column 15, line 12 - line 23 * * column 18, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * [A] 6,8 [Y] 2,13; | [YA]DE3817138 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,13 * abstract * * column 12, paragraph 3 * [A] 1,12; | [DA]DE4126578 (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]) [DA] 1,3,12,14 * abstract *; | [A]US4174174 (GRAFTON DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]GB1470470 (SPENCE BATE) [A] 1,12 * figure 1; claim 1 * | Examination | DE3343336 | by applicant | DE4126578 |