EP0691295 - Plate feeding device for plate dividing saws [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1998 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1999 [1999/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holzma-Maschinenbau GmbH Holzmastrasse 3 75365 Calw-Holzbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states Holzma-Maschinenbau GmbH Holzmastrasse 3 D-75365 Calw-Holzbronn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jenker, Erwin Donaustr. 60 D-71083 Herrenberg-Oberjesingen / DE | 02 /
Kempf, Martin Wetzenäckerweg 6 D-72202 Nagold / DE | [1996/02] | Representative(s) | Becker, Maria Patentanwältin, Auf dem Haigst 29 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | Becker, Maria, Dipl.-Phys. Auf dem Haigst 29 D-70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 95108608.1 | 06.06.1995 | [1996/02] | Priority number, date | DE19944423973 | 07.07.1994 Original published format: DE 4423973 | [1996/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0691295 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0691295 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B65H3/08, B21D43/24, B23Q7/10 | [1996/02] | CPC: |
B65H3/0816 (EP);
B27B31/00 (EP);
B65H5/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI [1996/02] | Title | German: | Plattenbeschickungseinrichtung für Plattenaufteilsägen | [1996/02] | English: | Plate feeding device for plate dividing saws | [1996/02] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation des plaques pour scies à découper des plaques | [1996/02] | Examination procedure | 20.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/13] | 28.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE744047 (E H GEORG SPIESS DR ING) [A] 1-4 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0494404 (JENKNER ERWIN [DE]) |