EP0686510 - Thermal transfer recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi, Kayaba-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states KAO CORPORATION 14-10, Nihonbashi, Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuse, Takashi, c/o Kao Corporation Res. Lab. 2606, Akabane, Ichikai-machi Haga-gun, Tochigi-ken / JP | 02 /
Yanagi, Hideki, c/o Kao Corporation Res. Lab. 2606, Akabane, Ichikai-machi Haga-gun, Tochigi-ken / JP | 03 /
Mitobe, Hiroyuki, c/o Kao Corporation Res. Lab. 2606, Akabane, Ichikai-machi Haga-gun, Tochigi-ken / JP | 04 /
Miyamoto, Masafumi c/o Kao Corporation Res. Lab. 2606, Akabane, Ichikai-machi Haga-gun, Tochigi-ken / JP | 05 /
Nawa, Masayoshi, c/o Kao Corporation Res. Lab. 2606, Akabane, Ichikai-machi Haga-gun, Tochigi-ken / JP | [1995/50] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/50] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95108787.3 | 07.06.1995 | [1995/50] | Priority number, date | JP19940129349 | 10.06.1994 Original published format: JP 12934994 | JP19940305163 | 08.12.1994 Original published format: JP 30516394 | [1995/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0686510 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0686510 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/38 | [1995/50] | CPC: |
B41M5/395 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31935 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/50] | Title | German: | Thermisches Übertragungsaufzeichnungsmaterial | [1995/50] | English: | Thermal transfer recording medium | [1995/50] | French: | Matériau pour l'enregistrement par transfert thermique | [1995/50] | Examination procedure | 23.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/30] | 19.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 07.10.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/36] | FR | 05.03.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0444641 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-9 * page 2, line 43 - line 57; claims 1-8 * * page 3, line 56 - page 5, line 10 * * examples 1-3 *; | [X]EP0420132 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * figures 1-2; examples 1,4-8 * * page 2, line 35 - line 53; claims 1-6 * * page 5, line 21 - line 44 *; | [X]EP0357363 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * page 2, line 58 - page 3, line 3 * * example 6; table 6 *; | [X]EP0339353 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * examples 1,4; claims 1-3 *; | [X]DE4141017 (KAO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * pages 10-11; examples 4-6,8 * * claims 1-4 * | by applicant | JPS61135791 | JPS6445688 |