EP0695519 - Hair curler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wiegner, Georg Flat E, 14/Fl., Hilton Tower, 96 Granville Road Tsimshatsui Kowloon / HK | [N/P] |
Former [1996/06] | For all designated states Wiegner, Georg Flat E, 14/Fl., Hilton Tower, 96 Granville Road Tsimshatsui, Kowloon / HK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Hyeong Sook (Morin) Flat E, 14/Fl., Hilton Tower, 96 Granville Road Tsimshatsui, Kowloon / HK | [1996/06] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1996/06] | Sparing - Röhl - Henseler Patentanwälte Rethelstrasse 123 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 95108873.1 | 08.06.1995 | [1996/06] | Priority number, date | DE19940009475U | 14.06.1994 Original published format: DE 9409475 U | DE1995200740U | 18.01.1995 Original published format: DE 29500740 U | [1996/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0695519 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0695519 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A45D2/12 | [1996/06] | CPC: |
A44B18/0023 (EP,US);
A45D2/2478 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, IT, LU, NL [1996/06] | Title | German: | Lockenwickler | [1996/06] | English: | Hair curler | [1996/06] | French: | Bigoudi | [1996/06] | Examination procedure | 08.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/32] | 09.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 08.06.2002 | [2004/39] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3675663 (CALANDRA SAM S) [A] 1,2,4,6,7; | [YA]US3566886 (SOLOMON NATHAN L) [Y] 1 [A] 2,6,7; | [YA]AT209014B (LACHOWICZ LUISE) [Y] 1 [A] 3,6,7; | [A]CH354905 (BAUMGARTNER OTTO [CH]) [A] 1,3,6,7; | [YA]DE4018202 (JUENEMANN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1 [A] 2,3,4,6,7; | [A]DE1238632 (GEORGE DE MESTRAL) [A] 1,4,5,6,7 |