EP0675237 - Reinforced concrete gutter element and gutter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PREFAEST S.A. Maxilly sur Saône 21270 Pontailler s/Saône / FR | [2000/20] |
Former [1995/40] | For all designated states PREFAEST S.A. Maxilly sur Saône F-21270 Pontailler s/Saône / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corberant, Gérard Rue de Malans F-70140 Pesmes / FR | [1995/40] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novagraaf International SA Avenue de Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | ||
Former [1995/40] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al NOVAPAT-CABINET CHEREAU, 9, Rue du Valais CH-1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 95109000.0 | 03.02.1995 | [1995/40] | Priority number, date | FR19940001758 | 16.02.1994 Original published format: FR 9401758 | [1995/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0675237 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0675237 | Date: | 02.01.1997 | [1997/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0675237 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | E03F3/04 | [1995/40] | CPC: |
E01C11/227 (EP);
E03F3/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, LI, LU, NL, PT [1995/40] | Title | German: | Rinnenelement aus Stahlbeton und Abflussrinne | [1995/40] | English: | Reinforced concrete gutter element and gutter | [1995/40] | French: | Elément de caniveau en béton armé et caniveau | [1995/40] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/37] | 26.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95101467.9 / EP0668408 | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.05.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.2000 | ES | 17.05.2000 | GB | 17.05.2000 | NL | 17.05.2000 | PT | 17.08.2000 | DE | 18.08.2000 | LU | 03.02.2001 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/08] | AT | 17.05.2000 | |
ES | 17.05.2000 | ||
GB | 17.05.2000 | ||
NL | 17.05.2000 | ||
PT | 17.08.2000 | ||
DE | 18.08.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 17.05.2000 | |
ES | 17.05.2000 | ||
GB | 17.05.2000 | ||
PT | 17.08.2000 | ||
DE | 18.08.2000 | ||
Former [2002/13] | AT | 17.05.2000 | |
GB | 17.05.2000 | ||
PT | 17.08.2000 | ||
DE | 18.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 17.05.2000 | |
GB | 17.05.2000 | ||
PT | 17.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/16] | AT | 17.05.2000 | |
PT | 17.08.2000 | ||
Former [2001/11] | AT | 17.05.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]FR2634234 (PREFAEST [FR]) [YD] 1,2,5 * the whole document * [A] 3; | [A]DE4007296 (BROERMANN RITA [DE]) [A] 4* figure - *; | [YDA]FR2649423 (PREFAEST SA [FR]) [YD] 1,2,5 * abstract * [A] 3 | by applicant | FR2634234 | FR2649423 |