EP0700759 - Food product slicer having an interlock mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.2000 [2000/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Premark FEG L.L.C. 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/30] | For all designated states Premark FEG L.L.C. 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | ||
Former [1996/11] | For all designated states PREMARK FEG CORPORATION 300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 509 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scherch, Richard Paul 15 Peregrine Place Piqua, Ohio 45356 / US | 02 /
Schrand, Timothy Allen 7346 Cherrywood Lane West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 03 /
Shirk, James Alan 135 Marrett Farm Road Union, Ohio 45322 / US | [1996/11] | Representative(s) | Howden, Christopher A., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/30] | Howden, Christopher Andrew, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/11] | Howden, Christopher Andrew FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95109350.9 | 16.06.1995 | [1996/11] | Priority number, date | US19940289684 | 12.08.1994 Original published format: US 289684 | [1996/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0700759 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0700759 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/22 | [1996/11] | CPC: |
B26D7/225 (EP,US);
B26D7/00 (EP,US);
B26D7/0616 (EP,US);
B26D7/088 (EP,US);
B26D7/22 (EP,US);
B26D2210/02 (EP,US);
Y10S83/932 (EP,US);
Y10T83/626 (EP,US);
Y10T83/6492 (EP,US);
Y10T83/6499 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/11] | Title | German: | Nahrungsmittel-Aufschnittschneidemaschine mit einem Verriegelungsmechanismus | [1996/11] | English: | Food product slicer having an interlock mechanism | [1996/11] | French: | Machine à trancher des produits alimentaires ayant un mécanisme de verrouillage | [1996/11] | Examination procedure | 02.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 24.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98121903.3 / EP0901891 | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3704736 (PRATLEY CLIFFORD) [A] 1,11 * abstract * * column 3 - column 6 *; | [A]EP0503168 (ARCONADA ARCONADA LUIS [ES]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3201520 (BERKEL PATENT NV [NL]) [A] 1,11 * figure - *; | [A]GB2090122 (LAN ELEC LTD) [A] 11 * figure - *; | [A]DE2749652 (HERMANN SCHARFEN FA) | by applicant | US4541319 |