EP0688640 - Accessory tile and its manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINO GANRYO KAGAKU CORPORATION 994-1, Oroshi-cho Toki-shi Gifu-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states MINO GANRYO KAGAKU CORPORATION 994-1, Oroshi-cho Toki-shi, Gifu-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kakamu, Yoshinori 999-1, Oroshi-cho Toki-shi, Gifu-ken, 509-52 / JP | 02 /
Kakamu, Shinichi 1000-6, Oroshi-cho Toki-shi, Gifu-ken, 509-52 / JP | 03 /
Kakamu, Shukichi 3053-30, Tsumagi-cho Toki-shi, Gifu-ken, 509-53 / JP | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o TBK-Patent, P.O. Box 20 19 18 80019 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/52] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95109547.0 | 20.06.1995 | [1995/52] | Priority number, date | JP19940139183 | 21.06.1994 Original published format: JP 13918394 | [1995/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0688640 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0688640 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.1995 | Classification | IPC: | B28B1/00, B28B3/00, B28B13/02 | [1995/52] | CPC: |
B28B1/002 (EP,US);
B28B3/00 (EP,US);
Y10S264/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/52] | Title | German: | Zusatz-Dachziegel und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1995/52] | English: | Accessory tile and its manufacturing method | [1995/52] | French: | Tuile auxiliaire et procédé pour sa fabrication | [1995/52] | Examination procedure | 14.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 21.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JPH06344318 ; | [XA]EP0591728 (MINO GANRYO KAGAKU CORP [JP]) [X] 37,38 * column 40, line 5 - column 64, line 51; figures 54A-82C; claims 22-26,52-55 * [A] 1,2,8-19,27-36; | [A]NL8105348 ; | [A]DE227308 (H. KAEHLER) [A] 1,2,9-15,19,20,26-33 * the whole document *; | [A]DE177481 (H. KAEHLER) [A] 1,2,9-15,19,20,26-33 * the whole document *; | [A]DE287358 (F. HAAG) [A] 1,2,15,19,20,33 * the whole document *; | [A]DE282990 (P. KAEHLER) [A] 1-3,5,19-21,33 * the whole document * | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 940, no. 12, Database accession no. (X - 0000), & JP06344318 A 19941220 (MINO GANRIYOU KAGAKU KK) [XP] 37,38 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 28, Database accession no. 83-709382, & NL8105348 A 19830616 (TEEUWEN BV) [A] 1,2,11,15,19,20,29,33 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH0430011U | JPH0242323 | JPH028883 |