EP0688850 - A liquid crystal composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2000 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 14.02.2001 [2001/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chisso Corporation 6-32, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-0055 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states Chisso Corporation 6-32, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakagawa, Etsuo 8890, Goi Ichiharashi, Chibaken / JP | 02 /
Sawada, Shinichi Block No. 168-11, No. 316-1, Saihiro Ichiharashi, Chibaken / JP | [1995/52] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/52] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95109820.1 | 23.06.1995 | [1995/52] | Priority number, date | JP19940164513 | 23.06.1994 Original published format: JP 16451394 | [1995/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0688850 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0688850 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0688850 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C09K19/30, C09K19/42 | [1995/52] | CPC: |
C09K19/3001 (EP,KR,US);
C09K19/42 (KR);
A63F13/30 (EP);
C09K19/12 (KR);
C09K19/16 (KR);
C09K19/44 (KR);
G02F1/13 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI [1995/52] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallzusammensetzung | [1995/52] | English: | A liquid crystal composition | [1995/52] | French: | Composition cristalline liquide | [1995/52] | Examination procedure | 14.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/15] | 09.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 07.10.1998 | LI | 07.10.1998 | GB | 23.06.1999 | [2001/07] |
Former [1999/22] | CH | 07.10.1998 | |
LI | 07.10.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH0558927 ; | [DA]EP0416117 (CHISSO CORP [JP]) [DA] 1,9,17 * examples 4,17; claim - *; | [A]EP0560382 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1* claim 5 *; | [A]EP0571916 (CHISSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,17 * examples 3,6; claim 1 * | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 15, Database accession no. 93-121299, & JPH0558927 A 00000000 (CHISSO CORP) [DA] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS5612322 | JPS5668636 | JPS56169633 | JPS572226 | JPS57114531 | JPS57154135 | JPS57165328 | JPS57185230 | JPS5964626 | JPS5970624 | JPS60152427 | JPS61207347 | JPS63152334 | JPS63503226 | JPH02501311 | JPH02233626 | JPH02289682 | JPH03500413 | JPH0558927 | - G. BAUER, CRYST. LIQ., (1981), vol. 63, no. 45 |