28.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] |
17.02.2006 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
06.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
26.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] |
19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
04.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] |
30.08.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] |
09.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
19.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
11.01.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2002 [2002/09] |
26.10.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2001 [2001/50] |
24.05.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2001 [2001/28] |
12.01.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] |
10.11.2000 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
03.11.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |
27.10.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] |
15.09.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.11.2000 [2000/44] |
08.09.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2000 [2000/43] |
01.10.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.11.1999 [1999/46] |
26.08.1999 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
26.08.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.08.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.08.1999 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
11.05.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
11.05.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.01.1999 |
First examination report |
|
28.01.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
06.01.1999 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
06.01.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.08.1998 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
10.07.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.11.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.12.1996 [1996/51] |
08.03.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.04.1996 [1996/17] |
17.01.1996 |
Change - extension states |
|