EP0708285 - Water-sanitary control valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pesovic, Predrag Danteova 50 YU-11000 Belgrad / YU | For all designated states Pesovic, Nemanja Danteova 50 YU-11000 Belgrad / YU | For all designated states Pesovic, Vojin Danteova 50 YU-11000 Belgrad / YU | [1996/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/17] | Representative(s) | Goetz, Rupert Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/17] | Goetz, Rupert, Dipl.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95110078.3 | 28.06.1995 | [1996/17] | Priority number, date | YU19940000417 | 29.06.1994 Original published format: YU 41794 | [1996/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0708285 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0708285 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/50, F16K1/02 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
F16K1/02 (EP,US);
F16K31/50 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7613 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/17] | Extension states | LT | 02.01.1996 | LV | 02.01.1996 | SI | 02.01.1996 | Title | German: | Sanitärventil | [1996/17] | English: | Water-sanitary control valve | [1996/17] | French: | Soupape sanitaire | [1996/17] | Examination procedure | 18.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/51] | 02.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.11.1995 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   29.12.1995 | 20.11.1995 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   02.01.1996 | 20.11.1995 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   02.01.1996 | 20.11.1995 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   02.01.1996 | 20.11.1995 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   02.01.1996 | 20.11.1995 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   02.01.1996 | 20.11.1995 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   02.01.1996 | 20.11.1995 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   02.01.1996 | 20.11.1995 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   02.01.1996 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.12.1998 | 30.06.1999 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   17.08.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.11.1999 | BE | 17.11.1999 | CH | 17.11.1999 | ES | 17.11.1999 | FR | 17.11.1999 | GR | 17.11.1999 | IT | 17.11.1999 | LI | 17.11.1999 | NL | 17.11.1999 | SE | 17.11.1999 | DK | 17.02.2000 | PT | 17.02.2000 | DE | 18.02.2000 | GB | 28.06.2000 | IE | 28.06.2000 | LU | 28.06.2000 | MC | 30.06.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
ES | 17.11.1999 | ||
FR | 17.11.1999 | ||
GR | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
NL | 17.11.1999 | ||
SE | 17.11.1999 | ||
DK | 17.02.2000 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
DE | 18.02.2000 | ||
GB | 28.06.2000 | ||
IE | 28.06.2000 | ||
LU | 28.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
ES | 17.11.1999 | ||
GR | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
NL | 17.11.1999 | ||
SE | 17.11.1999 | ||
DK | 17.02.2000 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
DE | 18.02.2000 | ||
FR | 14.04.2000 | ||
GB | 28.06.2000 | ||
IE | 28.06.2000 | ||
LU | 28.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2004/07] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
ES | 17.11.1999 | ||
GR | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
NL | 17.11.1999 | ||
SE | 17.11.1999 | ||
DK | 17.02.2000 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
DE | 18.02.2000 | ||
FR | 14.04.2000 | ||
GB | 28.06.2000 | ||
IE | 28.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
ES | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
NL | 17.11.1999 | ||
SE | 17.11.1999 | ||
DK | 17.02.2000 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
DE | 18.02.2000 | ||
FR | 14.04.2000 | ||
GB | 28.06.2000 | ||
IE | 28.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
ES | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
NL | 17.11.1999 | ||
SE | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
DE | 18.02.2000 | ||
FR | 14.04.2000 | ||
GB | 28.06.2000 | ||
IE | 28.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/42] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
ES | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
SE | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
DE | 18.02.2000 | ||
FR | 14.04.2000 | ||
GB | 28.06.2000 | ||
IE | 28.06.2000 | ||
MC | 30.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
ES | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
SE | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
DE | 18.02.2000 | ||
FR | 14.04.2000 | ||
GB | 28.06.2000 | ||
IE | 28.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
SE | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
DE | 18.02.2000 | ||
FR | 14.04.2000 | ||
GB | 28.06.2000 | ||
IE | 28.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/09] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
DE | 18.02.2000 | ||
FR | 14.04.2000 | ||
GB | 28.06.2000 | ||
IE | 28.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/50] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
FR | 14.04.2000 | ||
GB | 28.06.2000 | ||
IE | 28.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/28] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
FR | 14.04.2000 | ||
GB | 28.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
FR | 14.04.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
CH | 17.11.1999 | ||
LI | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 17.11.1999 | |
BE | 17.11.1999 | ||
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
CH | 22.02.2000 | ||
LI | 22.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 17.11.1999 | |
PT | 17.02.2000 | ||
CH | 22.02.2000 | ||
LI | 22.02.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | BE | 17.11.1999 | |
PT | 17.02.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DD27513 (VOIGT) [A] 1 * figures 1-3; claim 3 *; | [A]CH291888 (KUGLER FONDERIE ROBINETTERIE [CH]) [A] 1* figure 3 *; | [A]DE6910036U (IDEAL STANDARD [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 4; claim 5 *; | [A]DE2715218 (CORPON P VON) [A] 1 * figures 1,5-7; claim 1 *; | [A]WO8503754 (WILLIAMS WILLIAM J, et al) [A] 1 * figures 3,4 * | by applicant | YU41131C | YU19860001439 | YU19870000031 | YU19890002127 |