EP0690509 - Substrate contact for gate array base cell and method of forming same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashimoto, Masashi 14-32 Onogawa Tsukaba-shi, Ibaraki 305 / JP | 02 /
Hutter, Louis n. 2303 Silver Holly Lane Richardson, TX 75082 / US | 03 /
Mahant-Shetti, Shivaling S. 1405 Scottsboro Lane Richardson, TX 75082 / US | [1996/01] | Representative(s) | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz Prinz & Partner GbR Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 D-81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95110148.4 | 29.06.1995 | [1996/01] | Priority number, date | US19940268392 | 30.06.1994 Original published format: US 268392 | [1996/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0690509 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/118 | [1996/01] | CPC: |
H01L27/11803 (EP,US);
Y10S257/901 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/01] | Title | German: | Substratanschluss für eine Gate-Array-Basiszelle und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1996/01] | English: | Substrate contact for gate array base cell and method of forming same | [1996/01] | French: | Contact de substrat pour une cellule de base d'un circuit prédiffusé et procédé de fabrication | [1996/01] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/35] | 19.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/52] | 28.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62130538 ; | [A]JPS62160771 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871117), vol. 11, no. 351, Database accession no. (E - 557)<2798>, & JP62130538 A 19870612 (NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP) [A] 1-4,8,14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871226), vol. 11, no. 400, Database accession no. (E - 569), & JP62160771 A 19870716 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1,8,14 * abstract * |