EP0694294 - Socket of a joint prosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hermann, Werner Keltenweg 6 6312 Steinhausen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | For all designated states Hermann, Werner Keltenweg 6 CH-6312 Steinhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/05] | Representative(s) | Hotz, Klaus c/o OK pat AG Chamerstrasse 50 6300 Zug / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1996/05] | Hotz, Klaus, Dipl.-El.-Ing./ETH Patentanwalt c/o OK pat AG Hinterbergstrasse 36 Postfach 5254 CH-6330 Cham / CH | Application number, filing date | 95110318.3 | 03.07.1995 | [1996/05] | Priority number, date | CH19940002387 | 28.07.1994 Original published format: CH 238794 | [1996/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0694294 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0694294 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/34, A61F2/46 | [1996/05] | CPC: |
A61F2/30721 (EP);
A61F2/34 (EP);
A61F2/4637 (EP);
A61F2/4609 (EP);
A61F2002/3021 (EP);
A61F2002/30217 (EP);
A61F2002/30324 (EP);
A61F2002/30332 (EP);
A61F2002/30345 (EP);
A61F2002/30405 (EP);
A61F2002/30474 (EP);
A61F2002/30495 (EP);
A61F2002/30574 (EP);
A61F2002/30593 (EP);
A61F2002/30604 (EP);
A61F2002/3069 (EP);
A61F2002/30774 (EP);
A61F2002/30785 (EP);
A61F2002/3085 (EP);
A61F2002/3429 (EP);
A61F2002/3448 (EP);
A61F2002/4641 (EP);
A61F2002/4681 (EP);
A61F2220/0025 (EP);
A61F2220/0033 (EP);
A61F2230/0067 (EP);
A61F2250/0036 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/05] | Title | German: | Pfannenteil einer Gelenkprothese | [1996/05] | English: | Socket of a joint prosthesis | [1996/05] | French: | Cupule d'une prothèse d'articulation | [1996/05] | Examination procedure | 24.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/30] | 04.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8602261 (SOSTEGNI GIULIANO) [A] 1* page 8, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 3; figure - *; | [YA]EP0234811 (PFIZER HOSPITAL PROD [US]) [Y] 1,5 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 28; figure - * [A] 4,9; | [A]US5019105 (WILEY ROY C [US]) [A] 1,4,6 * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 44; figure - * * column 7, line 38 - column 7, line 68 *; | [Y]EP0482320 (HOWMEDICA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,5 * column 3, line 1 - column 3, line 19; figure - * * column 4, line 23 - column 5, line 31 *; | [A]WO9303687 (EXACTECH INC [US]) [A] 1,4,6 * page 12, line 33 - page 14, line 8; figure - * |