EP0693694 - Doppler radar system for automotive vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell International Corporation 2201 Seal Beach Boulevard Seal Beach, California 90740-8250 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | For all designated states ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION 2201 Seal Beach Boulevard Seal Beach, California 90740-8250 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Higgins, Aiden J. 2822 N. Shellcreek Place Westlake Village, CA 91360 / US | [1996/04] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95110367.0 | 03.07.1995 | [1996/04] | Priority number, date | US19940277466 | 20.07.1994 Original published format: US 277466 | [1996/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0693694 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0693694 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | [1996/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0693694 | Date: | 15.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/03, G01S13/93, G01S7/35, H01Q19/08 | [1996/17] | CPC: |
H01Q19/08 (EP,US);
G01S13/931 (EP,US);
G01S7/032 (EP,US);
G01S7/35 (EP,US);
G01S13/34 (EP,US);
G01S13/42 (EP,US);
G01S13/58 (EP,US);
G01S13/87 (EP,US);
G01S2013/9321 (EP,US);
G01S2013/9325 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1996/04] | G01S7/03, G01S13/93, G01S7/35 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/04] | Title | German: | Doppler-Radarsystem für Kraftfahrzeuge | [1996/04] | English: | Doppler radar system for automotive vehicles | [1996/04] | French: | Système de radar à Doppler pour véhicules automoteurs | [1996/04] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 15.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 15.09.1999 | IT | 15.09.1999 | SE | 15.09.1999 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 15.09.1999 | |
SE | 15.09.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | SE | 15.09.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2614429 (ESTEBAN MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0359911 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [A] 1; | [A]US5008678 (HERMAN MARTIN I [US]) [A] 2-4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0499706 (DORNIER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6* the whole document *; | [A] - CHANG, "I.C.'s for 94GHz Radar Applications", MICROWAVE JOURNAL, DEHAM MA USA, vol. 24, no. 6, pages 81 - 88 [A] 1 * page 81, column 2 - page 86, column 2; figures 5,8 * | [A] - COLQUHOUN A ET AL, "MMICS FOR AUTOMOTIVE AND TRAFFIC APPLICATIONS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE GALLIUM ARSENIDE INTEGRATED CIRCUIT SYMPOSIUM (GAAS IC), MIAMI BEACH, OCT. 4 - 7, 1992, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, no. SYMP. 14, pages 3 - 6, XP000346764 [A] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GAAS.1992.247236 |