Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9414331D0 | 07.09.1994 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9414331 | 15.07.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG33404 | 18.10.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9414331 | 15.07.1994 | SG1995000826 | 08.07.1995 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5852406 | 22.12.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9414331 | 15.07.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3256107B | Global Dossier | 12.02.2002 | B2 | JPH0865325 | 08.03.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9414331 | 15.07.1994 | US43581895 | 05.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0693729 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2000 | B1 | EP0693729 | 24.01.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9414331 | 15.07.1994 | US43581895 | 05.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1083590C | 24.04.2002 | C | CN1118477 | 13.03.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9414331 | 15.07.1994 | US43581895 | 05.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69515147T | 21.09.2000 | T2 | DE69515147D1 | 30.03.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9414331 | 15.07.1994 | US43581895 | 05.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100347407B | 06.03.2003 | B1 | KR960006396 | 23.02.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9414331 | 15.07.1994 | US43581895 | 05.05.1995 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY118231 | 30.09.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9414331 | 15.07.1994 | US43581895 | 05.05.1995 |