EP0693729 - Multi-protocol data bus system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.02.2001 [2001/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 10330 North Meridian St. Indianapolis, IN 46206 / US | [1996/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edde, Gabriel Alfred 8842 Malaga Drive, Apartment D Indianapolis, IN / US | 02 /
Landis, Michael David 9966 Aegan Road Fishers, Indiana / US | [1996/04] | Representative(s) | Wördemann, Hermes Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | Wördemann, Hermes, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Patent Dept., Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 95110386.0 | 04.07.1995 | [1996/04] | Priority number, date | GB19940014331 | 15.07.1994 Original published format: GB 9414331 | US19950435818 | 05.05.1995 Original published format: US 435818 | [1996/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0693729 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0693729 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/38, G06F13/42 | [1996/04] | CPC: |
G06F13/387 (EP);
G06F13/4291 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1996/04] | Title | German: | Mehrfachprotokoll-Datenbussystem | [1999/13] | English: | Multi-protocol data bus system | [1996/04] | French: | Système de bus de données de plusieurs protocoles | [1996/04] |
Former [1996/04] | Mehrfachprotokoll-Datenbussystems | Examination procedure | 26.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/34] | 10.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0504086 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 3, line 4 - line 43 * * figures 2,3; claims 6-9 *; | [DA]EP0588191 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [DA] 1-11 * column A * * page 2, line 41 - page 3, line 47 * * figures 1,2; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US4910509 (RABII KHOSRO M [US]) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 21 * | by applicant | US5276928 |