EP0692681 - Remotely controlling modulated flow to a fuel gas burner and valve therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.1997 [1997/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
King, Todd Leslie 1508 Galaxy Court Cedarburg, Wisconsin 53012 / US | 02 /
Mading, James Emmett W239 N6616 Maple Avenue Sussex, Wisconsin 53089 / US | 03 /
Piber, Earl Thomas 803 Byron Drive Osconomowoc, Wisconsin 53066 / US | [1996/03] | Representative(s) | Rüger, Rudolf, et al Rüger & Barthelt & Abel Postfach 348 73704 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | Rüger, Rudolf, Dr.-Ing., et al Rüger & Barthelt & Abel, Postfach 348 D-73704 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 95110518.8 | 06.07.1995 | [1996/03] | Priority number, date | US19940274319 | 13.07.1994 Original published format: US 274319 | [1996/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0692681 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F23N1/00, F16K3/24, F16K31/06 | [1996/03] | CPC: |
F16K31/0655 (EP,US);
F16K3/24 (EP,US);
F16K3/34 (EP,US);
F23N1/005 (EP,US);
F23N2227/36 (EP,US);
F23N2235/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/03] | Title | German: | Fernsteuerung für einen modulierten Strom eines Gasbrenners und Ventil dafür | [1996/03] | English: | Remotely controlling modulated flow to a fuel gas burner and valve therefor | [1996/03] | French: | Commande à distance pour un écoulement modulé d'un bruleur à gaz et sa soupape | [1996/03] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 18.07.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/15] | 11.11.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1997/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR1308653 (HEITZMANN) [X] 17,18,20,21 * the whole document * [A] 1,9,14; | [A]JPS56131872 ; | [A]FR2347619 (STEEL RADIATORS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,9,14,17 * the whole document *; | [A]US2516825 (HEJDUK ARTHUR A, et al) [A] 1,9,14,17 * figure - *; | [A]US4108134 (MALEC JERRY P) [A] 1,9,14,25 * figure - *; | [A]DE803323 (BOHN & KAEHLER MOTOREN UND MAS) [A] 1,9,14,17 * figure - *; | [A]JPS62284122 ; | [A]DE9107562U (ROSS EUROPA) [A] 1,9,14,17 * figure - *; | [A]EP0048440 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,9,14,17 * figure 4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820121), vol. 006, no. 010, Database accession no. (M - 107), & JP56131872 A 19811015 (CKD CONTROLS LTD) [A] 1,9,14,17 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880520), vol. 012, no. 169, Database accession no. (M - 699), & JP62284122 A 19871210 (RINNAI CORP) [A] 1,9,14,17 * abstract * |