EP0716994 - Installation for quick transloading of goods, especially of freight units for combined road-rail transport [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilgers AG Hilgersstrasse D-56598 Rheinbrohl / DE | [1996/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sarres, Dietrich Franz-Boas-Strasse 22 D-32427 Minden / DE | [1996/25] | Representative(s) | Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wissgott Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | COHAUSZ DAWIDOWICZ HANNIG & SOZIEN Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1996/25] | COHAUSZ HASE DAWIDOWICZ & PARTNER Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 95110605.3 | 07.07.1995 | [1996/25] | Priority number, date | DE19944444418 | 14.12.1994 Original published format: DE 4444418 | [1996/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0716994 | Date: | 19.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0716994 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65G63/00 | [1996/25] | CPC: |
B65G63/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/25] | Title | German: | Anlage zum Schnellumschlag von Transportgut, insbesondere von Ladeeinheiten für den kombinierten Ladungsverkehr | [1996/25] | English: | Installation for quick transloading of goods, especially of freight units for combined road-rail transport | [1996/25] | French: | Installation pour le transbordement rapide de marchandises, notamment d'unités de fret pour le transport combiné rail-route | [1996/25] | Examination procedure | 31.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/31] | 31.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 20.05.1998 | AT | 07.07.1998 | [2002/26] |
Former [2000/24] | AT | 07.07.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1900867 (MARSHALL OLDS) [A] 1* figures 1,2 *; | [DA]DE4120922 (KRUPP INDUSTRIETECH [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE4120922 |