Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2651369B | Global Dossier | 10.09.1997 | B2 | JPH0858828 | 05.03.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | DE9411517 | 15.07.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0694334 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2001 | B1 | EP0694334 | 31.01.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE9411517 | 15.07.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE205748T | 15.10.2001 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE9411517 | 15.07.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59509606D1 | 25.10.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE9411517 | 15.07.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE9411517U | 17.08.1995 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE9411517 | 15.07.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5670117 | 23.09.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | DE9411517 | 15.07.1994 |