EP0703030 - Rotary tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gühring, Jörg Franz-Schubert-Strasse 18 72458 Albstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states GÜHRING, Jörg Franz-Schubert-Strasse 18 D-72458 Albstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reinauer, Josef Weidenweg 23 D-72488 Sigmaringen / DE | [1996/13] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [1996/13] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 95110935.4 | 12.07.1995 | [1996/13] | Priority number, date | DE19944430197 | 25.08.1994 Original published format: DE 4430197 | [1996/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0703030 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0703030 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B23B29/034 | [1996/13] | CPC: |
B23B29/03421 (EP,US);
B23B51/00 (EP,US);
B23C5/109 (EP,US);
B23C5/2486 (EP,US);
Y10T408/85843 (EP,US);
Y10T408/8598 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/13] | Title | German: | Rundlaufendes Werkzeug | [1996/13] | English: | Rotary tool | [1996/13] | French: | Outil rotatif | [1996/13] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1996 | Examination requested [1996/37] | 11.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.01.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 11.01.2001 | [2003/45] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2266339 (SHUTZ JOHN A) [Y] 3-7 * page 1, column 2, line 34 - page 2, column 1, line 16; figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2125227 (HUARD UCF) [A] 10-14* figure 2 *; | [XY]US4428704 (KALOKHE SHIVDAS [CA]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 23; figures 1-6 * [Y] 3-7 |