EP0693544 - Process for the treatment and the recovery of crudes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.1999 [1999/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARCOLA PETROLIFERA S.p.A. S. S. Sulcitana 195-km 19 09018 Sarroch (CA) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | For all designated states ARCOLA PETROLIFERA S.p.A. S. S. Sulcitana 195-km 19 I-09018 Sarroch (CA) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marano, Danilo, c/o Arcola Petrolifera S.P.A. Via XXV Aprile 18 I-19021 Arcola SP / IT | 02 /
Fantin, Gian Paolo, c/o Arcola Petrolifera S.P.A. Via XXV Aprile 18 I-19021 Arcola SP / IT | [1996/04] | Representative(s) | Trupiano, Roberto BREVETTI EUROPA S.r.l. Corso di Porta Ticinese, 3 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/04] | Trupiano, Roberto BREVETTI EUROPA S.r.l. Piazza Bernini, 6 I-20133 Milano (MI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 95110952.9 | 13.07.1995 | [1996/04] | Priority number, date | IT1994MI01513 | 20.07.1994 Original published format: IT MI941513 | [1996/04] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0693544 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0693544 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C10G33/06, C10G31/10, C10G53/02 | [1996/19] | CPC: |
C10G33/06 (EP);
C10G31/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/04] | C10G33/06, C10G31/10 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, NL [1996/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung und Gewinnung von Rohöl | [1996/04] | English: | Process for the treatment and the recovery of crudes | [1996/04] | French: | Procédé de traitement et de récupération d'huiles brutes | [1996/04] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1996 | Examination requested [1996/31] | 30.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/04] | 08.09.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1998 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4990237 (HEUER STEVEN R [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-15 *; | [A]DE4205885 (MEINKEN); | [A]US5269906 (REYNOLDS VICTOR R [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1-30 * |