EP0679038 - Television receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | ||
Former [1995/43] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu, 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshimi, Osamu 779-5, Yamasaki, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka 618 / JP | 02 /
Shimizu, Yoshikazu 37-6, Onohara Higashi 6-chome Minoo-shi, Osaka 562 / JP | 03 /
Aiyama, Kunio 774 East Naples Court 164 Chula Vista, CA 91911 / US | [1996/10] |
Former [1995/43] | 01 /
Yoshimi, Osamu 1-3-5-402, Wakayamadai, Shimamoto-cho Mishima-gun, Osaka / JP | ||
02 /
Shimizu, Yoshikazu 2-1-1108, Aikawa 1-chome Higashi-Yodogawa-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
03 /
Aiyama, Kunio 12-20, Kibougaoka 3-chome, Toyono-cho Toyono-gun, Osaka / JP | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/43] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys. Rotermund Morgan B.Sc.(Phys.) Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95110997.4 | 17.07.1991 | [1995/43] | Priority number, date | JP19900195362 | 23.07.1990 Original published format: JP 19536290 | [1995/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0679038 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0679038 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0679038 | Date: | 03.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0679038 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H04N17/04 | [1995/43] | CPC: |
H04N5/44 (EP,US);
H04N17/04 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/43] | Title | German: | Fernsehempfänger | [1995/43] | English: | Television receiver | [1995/43] | French: | Récepteur de télévision | [1995/43] | Examination procedure | 13.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/43] | 12.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91111947.7 / EP0468356 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.12.1999
14.12.1999
ADMISSIBLE Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Leibnizstrasse 6 95447 Bayreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.12.1999
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 18.01.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.05.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.06.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.07.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.07.2001 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 16.11.2004 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.11.2004 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 25.04.2005 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 05.09.2001 | Appeal received No. T1011/01 | 15.11.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.11.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 16.11.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.11.1994 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 03.02.2004 | FR | 31.03.2004 | [2004/45] |
Former [2004/44] | DE | 03.02.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4858006 (SUZUKI MASAKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,5 * the whole document *; | [A] - SAITOH ET AL, "a new TV receiver", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, NEW YORK US, vol. 34, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/30.20187, pages 807 - 812, XP000026870 [A] 1,3,5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.20187 | Opposition | DE3105301 |