EP0692748 - Toner cartridge for a developing device included in an image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.09.1999 [1999/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd 3-6, 1-chome Nakamagome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ichikawa, Hideo 21-21, Miyuki-cho Numazu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Terazawa, Seiji 1-36-305, Honda-machi Numazu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 03 /
Ikeda, Sunao 14-7-203, Takashimahon-cho Numazu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1996/03] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/03] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 D-81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95111073.3 | 14.07.1995 | [1996/03] | Priority number, date | JP19940163774 | 15.07.1994 Original published format: JP 16377494 | JP19940221610 | 16.09.1994 Original published format: JP 22161094 | JP19940310773 | 14.12.1994 Original published format: JP 31077394 | JP19950123498 | 23.05.1995 Original published format: JP 12349895 | [1996/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0692748 | Date: | 17.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0692748 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08 | [1996/03] | CPC: |
G03G15/0886 (EP,US);
G03G15/0875 (EP,US);
G03G15/0877 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/03] | Title | German: | Tonerbehälter für eine Entwicklungsvorrichtung in einem Bildaufzeichnungsgerät | [1996/03] | English: | Toner cartridge for a developing device included in an image forming apparatus | [1996/03] | French: | Récipient de toner pour un dispositif de développement dans un appareil de formation d'images | [1996/03] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1995 | Examination requested [1996/03] | 09.09.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.03.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0360198 (KAO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,4-7 * whole document *; | [A]US5202732 (YAHATA MASASUMI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * * column 3, line 17 - line 58 *; | [A]JPH0546026 ; | [A]JPH0453982 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930628), vol. 17, no. 341, Database accession no. (P - 1565), & JP05046026 A 19930226 (RICOH) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920604), vol. 16, no. 243, Database accession no. (P - 1364), & JP04053982 A 19920221 (RICOH) [A] 1 * abstract * |