EP0676656 - Reflective optical system having multiple simultaneous viewing functions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYTHEON COMPANY 141 Spring Street Lexington Massachusetts 02173 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states RAYTHEON COMPANY 141 Spring Street Lexington, Massachusetts 02173 / US | ||
Former [1999/02] | For all designated states RAYTHEON COMPANY 141 Spring Street Lexington Massachusetts 02173 / US | ||
Former [1995/41] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cook, Lacy G. 615 Eucalyptus Drive E1 Segundo, CA 90245 / US | [1995/41] | Representative(s) | Otten, Hajo, et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/41] | Otten, Hajo, Dr.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert & Otten Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121 D-70178 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 95111142.6 | 01.05.1992 | [1995/41] | Priority number, date | US19910694963 | 02.05.1991 Original published format: US 694963 | [1995/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0676656 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0676656 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G02B17/06 | [1995/41] | CPC: |
G02B17/0663 (EP,US);
G02B17/061 (EP,US);
G02B17/0694 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/41] | Title | German: | Optisches Spiegelsystem mit mehreren gleichzeitigen Beobachtungsfunktionen | [1995/41] | English: | Reflective optical system having multiple simultaneous viewing functions | [1995/41] | French: | Système optique réflectif ayant plusieurs fonctions d'observation simultanées | [1995/41] | Examination procedure | 12.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/19] | 03.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92107468.8 / EP0512439 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/33] | Request for further processing for: | 30.03.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 30.03.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.04.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4101195 (FROSCH ROBERT A ADMINISTRATOR, et al) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 53; figure 2 * | [YD] - SWANSON ET AL., "System concept for a moderate cost Large Deployable Reflector", OPTICAL ENGINEERING., BELLINGHAM US, (198609), vol. 25, no. 9, pages 1045 - 1054, XP001620875 [YD] 1-3 * page 1048, column R - page 1049, column L; figure 6 * | [YD] - J.B.ODOM ET AL., "Technology and the Hubble Space Telescope Satellite", 19TH ANNUAL ELECTRONICS AND AEROSPACE SYSTEMS CONFERENCE (EASCON 86), WASHINGTON,DC,US, (19860908), pages 174 - 180 [YD] 1-3 * page 175 - page 176; figures 2,3 * | by applicant | US3674334 | - P.N. SWANSON ET AL., "System Concept for a Moderate Cost Large Deployable Reflector", OPTICAL ENGINEERING, (198609), vol. 25, no. 9, XP001620875 |