EP0695985 - Logon certificates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/06] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Misra, Pradyumna K. 25735 S.E. 32nd Place Issaquah, Washington 98027 / US | 02 /
Miller, Arnold S. 12806 S.E. 22nd Place Bellevue, Washington 98005 / US | 03 /
Ward, Richard B. 7518 Bagley Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98103-4964 / US | [1996/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/06] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95111261.4 | 18.07.1995 | [1996/06] | Priority number, date | US19940277144 | 18.07.1994 Original published format: US 277144 | [1996/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0695985 | Date: | 07.02.1996 | [1996/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0695985 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/00 | [1996/06] | CPC: |
G06F21/33 (EP,US);
G06F21/6236 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3821 (EP,US);
H04L63/0823 (EP,US);
H04L63/12 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/06] | Title | German: | Anmeldungszertifikate | [1996/06] | English: | Logon certificates | [1996/06] | French: | Certificats d'entrée | [1996/06] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/40] | 15.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2238636 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,7,9,27 * page 7, line 10 - page 9, line 14 * [Y] 5,8,28; | [Y]EP0421409 (IBM [US]) [Y] 5,12,21 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5224163 (GASSER MORRIE [US], et al) [Y] 8,26,28,31 * column 3, line 7 - line 48 * * column 6, line 34 - column 8, line 59 * | [XY] - S.MUFTIC ET AL, "Security Architecture for Distributed Systems", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, OXFORD, GB;, (199407), vol. 17, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1016/0140-3664(94)90104-X, pages 492 - 500, XP000447007 [X] 10,14,15,17,18,29,32,33 * the whole document * [Y] 12,21,26,31 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0140-3664(94)90104-X |