EP0684249 - Phosphine compounds, complexes containing the phosphine compounds as ligands, and process for producing optically active aldehydes using the phosphine compounds or complexes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2006 | New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takasago International Corporation 37-1, Kamata 5-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | For all designated states Takasago International Corporation 37-1, Kamata 5-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states Takasago International Corporation 37-1, Kamata 5-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo, 100 / JP | |||
Former [1996/02] | For all designated states Takasago International Corporation 19-22, Takanawa 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo, 100 / JP | |||
Former [1995/48] | For all designated states Takasago International Corporation 19-22, Takanawa 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Takao c/o Takasago Intern. Corp. Fine Chem. Laboratory 4-11, Nishiyawata 1-chome Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Matsumura, Kazuhiko c/o Takasago Intern. Corp. Fine Chem. Laboratory 4-11, Nishiyawata 1-chome Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Kato, Yasushi c/o Takasago Intern. Corporation Fine Chem. Laboratory 4-11, Nishiyawata 1-chome, Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Sayo, Noboru c/o Takasago Intern. Corporation Fine Chem. Laboratory 4-11, Nishiyawata 1-chome Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Kumobayashi, Hidenori c/o Takasago Intern. Corp. Fine Chem. Laboratory 4-11, Nishiyawata 1-chome Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1995/48] | Representative(s) | Dixon, Donald Cossar, et al Wilson Gunn Gee Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Dixon, Donald Cossar, et al Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | ||
Former [1995/48] | Moore, Anthony John, et al Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 95111575.7 | 11.03.1994 | [1995/48] | Priority number, date | JP19930077484 | 12.03.1993 Original published format: JP 7748493 | [1995/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0684249 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0684249 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/50, C07F15/00, C07C45/50, C07F9/6574, C07F9/6568 | [1995/48] | CPC: |
C07F15/008 (EP);
C07C45/50 (EP);
C07C45/505 (EP);
C07C67/293 (EP);
C07D205/08 (EP);
C07D205/085 (EP);
C07F9/5022 (EP);
C07F9/65683 (EP);
C07F9/65744 (EP);
Y02P20/55 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/505, C07C47/228 (EP);
C07C45/50, C07C47/453 (EP);
C07C67/293, C07C69/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/48] | Title | German: | Phosphin-Verbindungen, diese Phosphin-Verbindungen als ligande enthaltende Komplexe, Verfahren zur Herstellung von optisch-aktiven Aldehyden durch Mittel der Phosphin-Verbindungen oder des Komplexes | [1995/48] | English: | Phosphine compounds, complexes containing the phosphine compounds as ligands, and process for producing optically active aldehydes using the phosphine compounds or complexes | [1995/48] | French: | Composés de phosphines, complexes contenant les composés de phosphines comme ligands, procédé pour préparer des aldéhydes optiquement actifs en utilisant les composés de phosphines ou les complexes | [1995/48] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 08.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.03.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 23.03.2001 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 23.05.2001 | Appeal received No. T0021/02 | 23.05.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | 31.07.2001 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 31.07.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94301775.6 / EP0614903 | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0104375 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0503884 (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5171892 (BURK MARK J [US]) [Y] 1-6 * column W *; | [Y]WO9303839 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]) [Y] 1-6 * see particularly example 6, page 62 *; | [PX] - NOZOMU SAKAI, "Highly Enantioselective Hydroformylation of Olefins Catalized by New Phosphinephosphite-Rh(I) Complexes", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC US, (19930728), vol. 115, no. 15, doi:doi:10.1021/ja00068a095, pages 7033 - 7034, XP001145906 [PX] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00068a095 |