EP0684230 - 4-£(R)-1'-formylethyl azetidin-2-one derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takasago International Corporation 37-1, Kamata 5-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | For all designated states Takasago International Corporation 37-1, Kamata 5-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1995/48] | For all designated states Takasago International Corporation 19-22, Takanawa 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Takao c/o Takasago Intern. Corp. Fine Chem. Laboratory 4-11, Nishiyawata 1-chome Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Matsumura, Kazuhiko c/o Takasago Intern. Corp. Fine Chem. Laboratory 4-11, Nishiyawata 1-chome Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Kato, Yasushi c/o Takasago Intern. Corp. Fine Chem. Laboratory 4-11, Nishiyawata 1-chome Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Sayo, Noboru c/o Takasago Intern. Corporation Fine Chem. Laboratory 4-11, Nishiyawata 1-chome Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Kumobayashi, Hidenori c/o Takasago Intern. Corp. Fine Chem. Laboratory 4-11, Nishiyawata 1-chome Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1995/48] | Representative(s) | Dixon, Donald Cossar, et al Wilson Gunn Gee Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | Dixon, Donald Cossar, et al Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | ||
Former [1995/48] | Moore, Anthony John, et al Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 95111576.5 | 11.03.1994 | [1995/48] | Priority number, date | JP19930077484 | 12.03.1993 Original published format: JP 7748493 | [1995/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0684230 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0684230 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07D205/08, C07F7/18, C07D487/04 | [1995/48] | CPC: |
C07F15/008 (EP);
C07C45/50 (EP);
C07C45/505 (EP);
C07C67/293 (EP);
C07D205/08 (EP);
C07D205/085 (EP);
C07F9/5022 (EP);
C07F9/65683 (EP);
C07F9/65744 (EP);
Y02P20/55 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/505, C07C47/228 (EP);
C07C45/50, C07C47/453 (EP);
C07C67/293, C07C69/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/48] | Title | German: | 4-(R)-1'-Formylethyl Azetidin-2-on-Derivate | [1995/48] | English: | 4-£(R)-1'-formylethyl azetidin-2-one derivatives | [1995/48] | French: | Dérivés de 4-(R)-1'-formyléthyl-azetidin-2-one | [1995/48] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 17.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94301775.6 / EP0614903 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0010317 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [Y] 1,2*pages 44, 45 and 49 *; | [Y]EP0089139 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) [Y] 1,2 *pages 32, 49 and 59*; | [X]EP0113101 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [X] 1,2 *Page 12, formula 11; page 16, line 24-line 31; page 54-page 56 and page 59* | Examination | EP0180189 | EP0188816 | WO8801619 | - SASAKI ET AL, "Synthetic Studies of Carbapenem and Penem Antibiotics. III. A Synthesis of a Key Intermediate for 1-beta-Methylcarbapenem", CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1992), vol. 40, no. 5, pages 1098 - 1104 | - SHIRAI ET AL, "A New Synthetic Route to the Key Precursor of 1-beta-Methylcarbapenem Antibiotics from (S)-Methyl 3-Hydroxy-2-methylpropanoate", CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (1989), pages 445 - 448 | - SHIRAI ET AL, "A novel, double asymmetric aldol approach to the synthesis of a 1-beta-methyl carbapenem antibiotic precursor", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1988), vol. 29, no. 49, pages 6461 - 6464 | - KAWABATA ET AL, "A novel and efficient synthesis of the key intermediate of 1-beta-methylcarbapenem antibiotics employing [2+2]-cycloaddition reaction of diketene with a chiral imine", TETRAHEDRON, (1988), vol. 44, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1016/S0040-4020(01)81722-1, pages 2149 - 2165, XP003013245 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(01)81722-1 | - KAWABATA ET AL, "A novel and efficient synthesis of the key intermediate of 1-beta-methylcarbapenem antibiotics from (S)-methyl 3-hydroxy-2-methylpropionate", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1986), vol. 27, no. 51, pages 6241 - 6244 | - SHIH ET AL, "Synthetic carbapenem antibiotics. III. 1-Methyl thienamycin", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1985), vol. 26, no. 5, pages 587 - 590 | - BERKS, ANDREW H, "TETRAHEDRON REPORT NUMBER 387. Preparations of Two Pivotal Intermediates for the Synthesis of 1-beta-Methyl Carbapenem Antibiotics", TETRAHEDRON, (1996), vol. 52, no. 2, pages 331 - 375 |