EP0702232 - Process for evaluating the state of human hair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2001 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GOLDWELL GmbH Zerninstrasse 10-18 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | For all designated states GOLDWELL GmbH Zerninstrasse 10-18 D-64297 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morita, Kenichi Altengassweg 36 D-64625 Bensheim / DE | [1996/12] | Application number, filing date | 95111663.1 | 25.07.1995 | [1996/12] | Priority number, date | DE19944432854 | 15.09.1994 Original published format: DE 4432854 | [1996/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0702232 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702232 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/52 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
G01N33/52 (EP);
G01N2333/4742 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Untersuchung des Zustandes von menschlichem Haar | [1996/12] | English: | Process for evaluating the state of human hair | [1996/12] | French: | Procédé pour évaluer l'état des cheveux humains | [1996/12] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/13] | 18.01.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 10.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1997 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.09.1997 | 31.07.1998 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.09.1998 | 31.07.2000 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.08.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 08.11.2000 | NL | 08.11.2000 | AT | 25.07.2001 | BE | 31.07.2001 | CH | 31.07.2001 | LI | 31.07.2001 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/10] | NL | 08.11.2000 | |
AT | 25.07.2001 | ||
BE | 31.07.2001 | ||
CH | 31.07.2001 | ||
LI | 31.07.2001 | ||
Former [2003/06] | NL | 08.11.2000 | |
BE | 31.07.2001 | ||
CH | 31.07.2001 | ||
LI | 31.07.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 31.07.2001 | |
LI | 31.07.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2027195 (OREAL)[A] 1-8; | [DA]EP0193692 (OREAL [FR]) [DA] 1-8 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS [A] 1 | by applicant | EP0193692 |