EP0698609 - Alpha-phosphorus substituted sulfinate derivatives as squalene synthetase inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/09] | For all designated states BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY P.O. Box 4000 Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lawrence, Michael R. 48 W. Crown Terrace Yardley, PA / US | 02 /
Biller, Scott A. 31 Second Street Hopewell, New Jersey 08525 / US | 03 /
Fryszman, Olga M. 63 Riverside Drive Princeton, NJ. / US | [1996/15] |
Former [1996/09] | 01 /
Lawrence, Michael R. 48 W. Crown Terrace Yardley, PA / US | ||
02 /
Biller, Scott A. 136 Nancy Lane Ewing, NJ / US | |||
03 /
Fryszman, Olga M. 63 Riverside Drive Princeton, NJ. / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/09] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95111770.4 | 26.07.1995 | [1996/09] | Priority number, date | US19940295121 | 24.08.1994 Original published format: US 295121 | [1996/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0698609 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/38, A61K31/66, C07F9/40, C07F9/58, C07F9/30 | [1996/09] | CPC: |
C07F9/655345 (EP,US);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07F9/3808 (EP,US);
C07F9/3826 (EP,US);
C07F9/383 (EP,US);
C07F9/3882 (EP,US);
C07F9/4006 (EP,US);
C07F9/4015 (EP,US);
C07F9/4018 (EP,US);
C07F9/4056 (EP,US);
C07F9/5728 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/09] | Title | German: | Alpha-Phosphor substituierte Sulfinat-Derivate als Squalen Synthetase Inhibitoren | [1996/09] | English: | Alpha-phosphorus substituted sulfinate derivatives as squalene synthetase inhibitors | [1996/09] | French: | Dérivés sulfinates substitués en alpha par du phosphore comme inhibiteurs de la squalène synthétase | [1996/09] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/43] | 17.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/04] | 31.08.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0595635 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]) [A] 1,23-32 * the whole document *; | [A]US5312814 (BILLER SCOTT A [US], et al) [A] 1,23-32* column W * |