EP0697540 - Pneumatic spring, especially for the gas exchange valves of internal combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.2000 [2000/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft 80788 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/08] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung AJ-3 D-80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulz, Ulrich Esmarchstrasse 9 D-80999 München / DE | [1996/08] | Application number, filing date | 95111924.7 | 28.07.1995 | [1996/08] | Priority number, date | DE19944428677 | 12.08.1994 Original published format: DE 4428677 | [1996/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0697540 | Date: | 21.02.1996 | [1996/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0697540 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | [1996/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0697540 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16F9/02, F01L1/46, F16F9/36 | [1996/08] | CPC: |
F01L1/465 (EP);
F16F9/0209 (EP);
F16F9/04 (EP);
F16F9/362 (EP);
B60G2202/152 (EP);
F16F2232/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/08] | Title | German: | Pneumatische Feder, insbesondere für Gaswechselventile von Brennkraftmaschinen | [1996/08] | English: | Pneumatic spring, especially for the gas exchange valves of internal combustion engines | [1996/08] | French: | Ressort pneumatique, notamment pour les soupapes d'échange gazeux de moteurs à combustion interne | [1996/08] | Examination procedure | 29.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/44] | 28.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.03.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2122721 (LUCAS IND PLC) [Y] 1,2,9 * figures 1,2 *; | [YD]US1695011 (GUIDO FORNACA) [YD] 1 * figure 1 *; | [Y]CH671808 (GUALTIERO SARTORI) [Y] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]FR3847E (JULES BERNARD [FR], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH02283811 ; | [A]FR1227839 (DUPONT,E.; PROST, C.) [A] 1 * figure 11 *; | [A]GB392294 (ALBERT EUSTACE SHORT, et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE3814568 (STABILUS GMBH [DE]) [A] * figure - *; | [PA]EP0622135 (AMADA METRECS CO [JP]) [PA] 1,9 * column 3, line 17 - line 23; figure 1 * | [Y] - MTZ MOTORTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT, vol. 50, page 305 [Y] 1,2,9 * page 305; figure 8 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910206), vol. 015, no. 049, Database accession no. (M - 1078), & JP02283811 A 19901121 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,10 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2529616 | JPH02283809 | US1695011 |