EP0686480 - Stereolithographic supports [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3D SYSTEMS, INC. 26081 Avenue Hall Valencia California 91355 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states 3D SYSTEMS, INC. 26081 Avenue Hall Valencia, California 91355 / US | ||
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states 3D SYSTEMS, INC. 26081 Avenue Hall Valencia California 91355 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hull, Charles W. 28155 North Tamarack Lane Santa Clarita, CA 91350 / US | 02 /
Lewis, Charles W. 3930 Cody Road Sherman Oaks, CA 91403 / US | [1995/50] | Representative(s) | Hess, Peter K. G., et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/47] | Hess, Peter K., Dipl.-Phys., et al Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg-Geissler-Isenbruck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/50] | Frohwitter, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95111925.4 | 17.04.1989 | [1995/50] | Priority number, date | US19880182801 | 18.04.1988 Original published format: US 182801 | US19880269801 | 08.11.1988 Original published format: US 269801 | [1995/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0686480 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0686480 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | [1996/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0686480 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/00 | [1995/50] | CPC: |
G06T17/20 (EP);
B29C35/08 (KR);
B29C41/12 (EP);
B29C41/36 (EP);
B29C64/135 (EP);
B29C64/40 (EP);
B29C67/00 (KR);
G01J1/4257 (EP);
G03F7/0037 (EP);
G03F7/70416 (EP);
G06T17/00 (EP);
G06T17/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/50] | Title | German: | Stereolithografische Stützen | [1995/50] | English: | Stereolithographic supports | [1995/50] | French: | Supports stéréolithographiques | [1995/50] | Examination procedure | 28.07.1995 | Examination requested [1995/50] | 14.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89303786.1 / EP0338751 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/47] | Request for further processing for: | 04.10.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 04.10.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.10.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.11.2001 | CH | 28.11.2001 | GR | 28.11.2001 | IT | 28.11.2001 | LI | 28.11.2001 | SE | 28.02.2002 | LU | 17.04.2002 | ES | 30.05.2002 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 28.11.2001 | |
CH | 28.11.2001 | ||
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
LI | 28.11.2001 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
LU | 17.04.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 28.11.2001 | |
CH | 28.11.2001 | ||
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
LI | 28.11.2001 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
ES | 30.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 28.11.2001 | |
CH | 28.11.2001 | ||
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
LI | 28.11.2001 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 28.11.2001 | |
GR | 28.11.2001 | ||
LI | 28.11.2001 | ||
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | GR | 28.11.2001 | |
SE | 28.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/26] | SE | 28.02.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60247515 ; | [A]US4575330 (HULL CHARLES W [US]) [A] 1-24 * figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP0250121 (SCITEX CORP LTD [IL]) [X] 1-24 * column 15, line 30 - line 41; figures 6,9; claims 1,19,22,23,25,27 * * column 18, line 21 - line 26 *; | [E]WO9011178 (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 1-24 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860502), vol. 010, no. 118, Database accession no. (M - 475), & JP60247515 A 19851207 (OOSAKAFU) [A] 1-24 * abstract * | by applicant | US4041476 | US4078229 | US4238840 | US4288861 | US4575330 | US19880183014 | US19880183012 | US19890269801 | US19890268816 | US19890268907 | US19890268429 | US19890268408 | US19880182823 | US19880182830 | US19880183015 | US19880182801 | US19880183016 |