Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0696574
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
04.08.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.09.2000 [2000/38] |
20.08.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.10.1999 [1999/40] |
11.08.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.06.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.02.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
09.02.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.10.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
11.08.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.08.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
01.07.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.05.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
06.03.1998 |
First examination report |
|
27.02.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.08.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.08.1996 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.09.1996 [1996/38] |
08.01.1996 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.02.1996 [1996/07] |