EP0680734 - Endovascular grafting apparatus, system and method and devices for use therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2002 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENDOVASCULAR TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 1360 O'Brien Drive Menlo Park, California 94025-1436 / US | [1995/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lazarus, Harrison M. 324 Tenth Avenue No. 260 Salt Like City, Utah 84103 / US | 02 /
Williams, Ronald G. 1313 Sherman Avenue Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 03 /
Sterman, Wesley D. 2121 Sacramento Street Apt 604 San Francisco, California 94109 / US | 04 /
Piplani, Alex A. 141 Delmedio Avenue No 219 Mountain View, California 94040 / US | [1995/45] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [1995/45] | Mayes, Stuart David, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 95112010.4 | 15.07.1991 | [1995/45] | Priority number, date | US19900553530 | 13.07.1990 Original published format: US 553530 | [1995/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0680734 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0680734 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06, A61M25/10 | [1995/45] | CPC: |
A61B17/11 (EP,US);
A61F2/04 (EP,US);
A61F2/07 (EP,US);
A61F2/958 (EP,US);
A61M25/10 (EP,US);
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
A61F2/848 (EP,US);
A61F2/89 (EP,US);
A61F2002/075 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3008 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30451 (EP,US);
A61F2002/8486 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0008 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0016 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0058 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1995/45] | Title | German: | Endovaskulare Transplantierungsvorrichtung, System, Verfahren und Geräte zum Verwenden mit dieser Vorrichtung | [1995/45] | English: | Endovascular grafting apparatus, system and method and devices for use therewith | [1995/45] | French: | Dispositif de greffage endovasculaire, système, méthode et appareils à utiliser avec ce dispositif | [1995/45] | Examination procedure | 15.06.1996 | Examination requested [1996/33] | 26.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/13] | 23.10.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/13] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91306388.9 / EP0466518 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4562596 (KORNBERG ELLIOT [US]) [A] 6,7 * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 5; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]US4787899 (LAZARUS HARRISON M [US]); | [A]US4830003 (WOLFF RODNEY G [US], et al) [A] 3,8 * column A; figure 4; claim 8 *; | [DYA]WO8908433 (LAZARUS HARRISON M [US]) [DY] 1,4-6 * page 8, line 4 - page 12, line 19; figures 2-4,9-11 * [A] 10; | [PY]EP0423916 (COOK INC [US]) [PY] 1,4-6 * column A; figures 3,5-10C * | by applicant | US4787899 | WO8908433 |