Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2647814B | Global Dossier | 27.08.1997 | B2 | JPH0868421 | 12.03.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4429102 | 17.08.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0697298 | Global Dossier | 08.10.1997 | B1 | EP0697298 | 15.05.1996 | A3 | EP0697298 | 21.02.1996 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE4429102 | 17.08.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4429102 | 22.02.1996 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4429102 | 17.08.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59500765D1 | 13.11.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4429102 | 17.08.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2108525T | 16.12.1997 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4429102 | 17.08.1994 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5593233 | 14.01.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4429102 | 17.08.1994 |