Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.01.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2002 [2002/09] |
04.10.2001 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
23.08.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
02.03.2001 | First examination report | |
23.02.2001 | Examination report or reply | |
01.08.2000 | Renewal fee | |
16.07.1999 | Renewal fee | |
14.08.1998 | Renewal fee | |
02.08.1997 | Renewal fee | |
13.09.1996 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.10.1996 [1996/44] |
26.07.1996 | Publication of search report | published on 11.09.1996 [1996/37] |
12.07.1996 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] |