EP0702137 - Method and apparatus for adjusting the idling speed of a combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2002 [2002/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2001/51] |
Former [1996/12] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nusser, Claus-Dieter Hermann-Essig-Strasse 104 D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | 02 /
Sperling, Helmut Carl-Goedeler-Ring 47 D-38518 Gifhorn / DE | [1996/12] | Application number, filing date | 95112418.9 | 08.08.1995 | [1996/12] | Priority number, date | DE19944433300 | 19.09.1994 Original published format: DE 4433300 | [1996/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0702137 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0702137 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | [1998/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702137 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/08 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
F02D41/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT [1996/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Leerlaufeinstellung einer Brennkraftmaschine | [1996/12] | English: | Method and apparatus for adjusting the idling speed of a combustion engine | [1996/12] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour ajuster le ralenti d'un moteur à combustion | [1996/12] | Examination procedure | 16.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 09.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4402289 (IKEURA KENJI [JP]) [A] 1,2,9,11 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * column 2, line 27 - line 46 * * column 6, line 23 - line 61 * * column 7, line 19 - line 45 *; | [A]JPH0242118 ; | [DA]US4345557 (IKEURA KENJI) [DA] 2,4,5,8 * abstract * * figures 1-4,13 * * column 11, line 23 - line 49 * * column 20, line 28 - line 63 *; | [DA]US5002026 (OHKUMO HIROYA [JP], et al) [DA] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 23 * * column 3, line 27 - line 65 *; | [A]US4716871 (SAKAMOTO KATSUHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 2 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 61 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900425), vol. 014, no. 203, Database accession no. (M - 0966), & JP02042118 A 19900213 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 2 * abstract * | by applicant | DE3020494 | DE4016099 |