EP0702003 - Process for preparing 2-halogenpyridinaldehydes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/12] | Process for preparing 2-halogenpyridinaldehydes and new 2-halogenpyridinaldehydes | ||
[1998/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.1999 [1999/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1998/25] |
Former [1996/12] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beck, Gunther, Dr. Am Mittelberg 19 D-51375 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
Heitzer, Helmut, Dr. Höhenstr. 84 D-51381 Leverkusen / DE | [1996/12] | Application number, filing date | 95112442.9 | 08.08.1995 | [1996/12] | Priority number, date | DE19944429465 | 19.08.1994 Original published format: DE 4429465 | [1996/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0702003 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0702003 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | [1996/13] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0702003 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | [1996/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702003 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/61, C07D213/65, C07D213/78, C07D213/85 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
C07D213/80 (EP,US);
C07D213/61 (EP,US);
C07D213/65 (EP,US);
C07D213/82 (EP,US);
C07D213/84 (EP,US);
C07D213/85 (EP,US);
C07D409/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1996/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 2-Halogenpyridinaldehyden | [1998/25] | English: | Process for preparing 2-halogenpyridinaldehydes | [1998/25] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de 2-halogenpyridinaldehydes | [1998/25] |
Former [1996/12] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 2-Halogenpyridinaldehyden und neue 2-Halogenpyridinaldehyde | ||
Former [1996/12] | Process for preparing 2-halogenpyridinaldehydes and new 2-halogenpyridinaldehydes | ||
Former [1996/12] | Procédé pour la préparation de 2-halogenpyridinaldehydes et nouveaux 2-halogenpyridinaldehydes | Examination procedure | 07.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.12.2099 | Examination requested [1997/10] | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO9515313 (REILLY IND INC [US])[PX] 1-5; | [XD] - SREENIVASULU ET AL., "A one-pot synthesis of ...", IND. JOURN. CHEM., vol. 28B, pages 584 - 586 [XD] 1-4 * the whole document * | [XD] - AADIL ET AL., "Synthesis of 4,5 disubstituted 2-chloronicotinates", SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 23, no. 18, doi:doi:10.1080/00397919308012592, pages 2587 - 2592, XP002053872 [XD] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00397919308012592 | [Y] - METH-COHN O ET AL, "A versatile new synthesis of quinolines and related fused pyridines. Part 12. A general synthesis of 2-chloropyridines and 2-pyridones", J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS. 1 (JCPRB4,0300922X);84; (6); PP.1173-82, UNIV. SALFORD;CHEM. DEP.; SALFORD; MS 4WT; UK (GB) [Y] 5 * page 1175 * | [Y] - GUZMAN ET AL., "Vilsmeier-Haack Reaction with ...", J. ORG. CHEM., vol. 55, pages 5793 - 5797 [Y] 5 * Seite 523, Scheme II * | [Y] - MALLET, "Le phényl-lithium: nouvel angent de métalisation du cycle pryridinique", J. ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, vol. 406, pages 49 - 56 [Y] 5 * Seite 51, Tabel 1 * | [Y] - WINDSCHEIF, "Substituted dipyridylethenes ...", SYNTHESIS, pages 87 - 92 [Y] 5 * page 87 * | [Y] - NEW ET AL., "Atypical antipsychotic agents: ...", J. MED. CHEM., vol. 31, pages 618 - 624 [Y] 5 * Seite 618, Scheme I * | Examination | - C.A.120:134231 | - C.A.26:5096 | by applicant | DE2427096 | EP0001473 | US4279913 | DE3314196 | EP0107866 | EP0192060 | US4757073 | JPH0517475 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1990), vol. 55, page 5793 | - J. CHEM. SOC., PERKINS TRANS. I., (1984), page 1173 | - INDIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (1989), vol. 28B, page 584 | - SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, (1993), vol. 23, page 2587 | - STOFFKLASSE "PYRIDINE", STOFFKLASSE "PYRIDINE", K.H. BUECHEL (HERAUSG.), Pflanzenschutz und Schaedlingsbekaempfung, STUTTGART, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, (1977), page 229 | - J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS. I., (1984), page 1173 | - CAN. J. CHEM., (1965), vol. 48, page 773 | - CAN. J. CHEM., (1974), vol. 52, page 3626 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1990), vol. 55, page 571 |