EP0696691 - Dry friction material, dry blend and method of making a dry blend [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2000 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STERLING CHEMICALS INTERNATIONAL, INC. 1200 Smith Street, Suite 1900 Houston, Texas 77002-4312 / US | [1998/10] |
Former [1996/07] | For all designated states CYTEC TECHNOLOGY CORP. 1105 North Market Street, Suite 1300 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaminski, Stanley Sigmund 25 Woodland Place Stamford, CT 06902 / US | 02 /
Evans, Robert Ellsworth 30 Horse Stable Drive Huntington, CT 06484 / US | [1996/07] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/07] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Flüggenstrasse 13 D-80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95112531.9 | 09.08.1995 | [1996/07] | Priority number, date | US19950380266 | 30.01.1995 Original published format: US 380266 | US19940287736 | 09.08.1994 Original published format: US 287736 | US19940288363 | 09.08.1994 Original published format: US 288363 | [1996/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0696691 | Date: | 14.02.1996 | [1996/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0696691 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1995 | Classification | IPC: | F16D69/02, C08J5/04 | [1996/07] | CPC: |
C08J5/046 (EP);
C09K3/1028 (EP);
C08J2309/04 (EP);
C08J2321/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/07] | Title | German: | Trockenes Reibungsmaterial, trockene Mischung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1999/27] | English: | Dry friction material, dry blend and method of making a dry blend | [1996/07] | French: | Matériau de friction sec, mélange sec et méthode de préparation | [1996/07] |
Former [1996/07] | Trockenes Reibungsmaterial, trockne Mischung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | Examination procedure | 27.03.1996 | Examination requested [1996/22] | 12.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 09.08.1999 | MC | 29.02.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/18] | MC | 29.02.2000 | |
Former [2003/17] | MC | 07.09.1999 | |
Former [2000/52] | MC | 29.02.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]FR2507123 (ARJOMARI PRIOUX [FR]) [Y] 1,10,17 * page 1, line 27 - page 3, line 19 * * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 28 * * page 6, line 27 - line 31 * [A] 8; | [YA]EP0264096 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [Y] 10-13,17 * page 2, line 41 - page 3, line 25 * * page 6, line 35 - line 56 *[A] 1-4; | [YA]EP0352363 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [Y] 10-13,17 * page 2, line 41 - page 3, line 31 * * page 5, line 22 - line 58 * * page 6, line 19 - line 58 * [A] 1-4; | [YA]GB2224285 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4,9-11,13,17 * page 2, line 11 - line 34 * * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 9 * * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 25 * * page 9, line 16 - line 31 * [A] 5,8,14; | [YA]EP0444473 (AKEBONO BRAKE IND [JP]) [Y] 10,11,13,17 * page 2, line 14 - line 17 * * page 2, line 45 - page 3, line 34 * [A] 1,2,4; | [Y]EP0557905 (NISSHIN SPINNING [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4,9-11,13,17 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 40; example 1; claims 1-7 *; | [YPA]EP0647793 (AVCO CORP [US], et al) [YP] 10-13,17 * page 3, line 42 - page 5, line 51 * [A] 1-4,7,16 |