blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0702394

EP0702394 - Metal halide high pressure discharge lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
Former [1996/12]For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
D-81543 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Eisemann, Hans, Dr.
Siriusstr. 2
D-12524 Berlin / DE
02 / Genz, Andreas, Dr.
Fregestr. 11
D-12159 Berlin / DE
03 / Hohlfeld, Andreas, Dr.
Mommsenstr. 52
D-10629 Berlin / DE
[1996/12]
Application number, filing date95112860.216.08.1995
[1996/12]
Priority number, dateDE1994443261114.09.1994         Original published format: DE 4432611
[1996/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0702394
Date:20.03.1996
Language:DE
[1996/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0702394
Date:29.04.1998
[1998/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0702394
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.1998
ClassificationIPC:H01J61/12, H01J61/82, H01J61/34, H01J61/14
[1998/18]
CPC:
H01J61/12 (EP); H01J61/125 (EP); H01J61/14 (EP);
H01J61/26 (EP); H01J61/34 (EP); H01J61/827 (EP);
H01J61/86 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [1996/12]H01J61/12
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1996/12]
TitleGerman:Metallhalogenid-Hochdruckentladungslampe[1996/12]
English:Metal halide high pressure discharge lamp[1996/12]
French:Lampe à décharge haute pression à halogénure métallique[1996/12]
Examination procedure08.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/32]
15.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.1999Fee for grant paid
17.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.1997Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.1998Renewal fee patent year 04
20.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3761758  (KOURY F, et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 1 - line 37 * * column 3, line 37 - line 52 *;
 [AD]DE8912495U  (PATENT-TREUHAND-GESELLSCHAFT FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLÜHLAMPEN MBH) [AD] 1 * page 9, paragraph L *;
 [AD]EP0492205  (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * table - *
by applicantEP0391283
 EP0492205
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.