EP0701141 - Magnetic field sensor with Hall element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/11] | Magnetic field sensor with Hallelement | ||
[2002/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micronas GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states Micronas GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | ||
Former [1998/06] | For all designated states Micronas Intermetall GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | ||
Former [1996/11] | For all designated states Deutsche ITT Industries GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 D-79108 Freiburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Theus, Ulrich, Dr. Ing. Schönbergstrasse 5b D-79194 Gundelfingen / DE | 02 /
Motz, Mario, Dipl. Ing. Einsiedelnstrasse 6 D-79346 Endingen / DE | [1996/11] | Application number, filing date | 95112918.8 | 17.08.1995 | [1996/11] | Priority number, date | DE19944431703 | 06.09.1994 Original published format: DE 4431703 | [1996/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0701141 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0701141 | Date: | 05.11.1997 | [1997/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0701141 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/07 | [1996/11] | CPC: |
G01R33/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/11] | Title | German: | Magnetfeldsensor mit Hallelement | [1996/11] | English: | Magnetic field sensor with Hall element | [2002/10] | French: | Capteur de champs magnétique muni d'un élément de Hall | [1996/11] |
Former [1996/11] | Magnetic field sensor with Hallelement | Examination procedure | 06.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 06.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0450910 (HONEYWELL INC [US]); | [A]EP0460564 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [DA]EP0548391 (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE [DE]); | [A]DE4302342 (EL MOS ELEKTRONIK IN MOS TECHN [DE]) | by applicant | EP0548391 |