EP0709825 - Video scaling method and device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.1998 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.1998 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.11.1998 [1998/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION 1025 NASA Boulevard, Ms80 Melbourne, Florida 32919 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION 1025 NASA Boulevard, Ms80 Melbourne, Florida 32919 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malinowski, Christopher W. 325 Banyan Way Melbourne, Florida 32951 / US | 02 /
Zepp, Stanley R. 955 South Fork Circle Melbourne, Florida 32901 / US | [1996/18] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Leo, et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95113128.3 | 21.08.1995 | [1996/18] | Priority number, date | US19940301622 | 07.09.1994 Original published format: US 301622 | [1996/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0709825 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0709825 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | [1998/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/36, G09G1/16, G06T3/40 | [1997/52] | CPC: |
G06T3/4023 (EP,KR,US);
G06T3/4007 (KR);
G06F3/14 (EP,KR,US);
H04N7/01 (KR);
H04N9/64 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2340/0407 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/18] | G09G5/36, G09G1/16 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1996/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur massstäblichen Umformung von Videodaten | [1996/18] | English: | Video scaling method and device | [1996/18] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour cadrer des données vidéo | [1996/18] | Examination procedure | 07.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 17.07.1998 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1998/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0367418 (IBM [US]); | [A]WO9212495 (DU PONT [US]); | [X]EP0595301 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [X]WO9415435 (SID AHMED MAHER A [CA]); | [PX]WO9424632 (NORTHSHORE LAB INC [US]) |