EP0698745 - Digital control method and apparatus for rotary member supported by magnetic bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/09] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murakami, Chikara 3-3-3-1006, Kamiyugi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1996/09] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/09] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95113129.1 | 21.08.1995 | [1996/09] | Priority number, date | JP19940219550 | 22.08.1994 Original published format: JP 21955094 | JP19950207820 | 21.07.1995 Original published format: JP 20782095 | [1996/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0698745 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0698745 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | [1998/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16C39/06 | [1996/09] | CPC: |
F16C32/0455 (EP,US);
G05B11/00 (KR);
F16C2360/45 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1996/09] | Title | German: | Digitales Steuerungsverfahren und Gerät für ein von einem Magnetlager getragenes, drehendes Teil | [1996/09] | English: | Digital control method and apparatus for rotary member supported by magnetic bearing | [1996/09] | French: | Méthode et appareil de commande digital pour membre rotatif supporté par un palier magnétique | [1996/09] | Examination procedure | 31.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/44] | 23.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/02] | 06.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03163215 ; | [A]US4642500 (HIGUCHI TOSHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,7,11* column W *; | [A]EP0313727 (NAT AEROSPACE LAB [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,7,11 * abstract * * column 1, line 40 - column 4, line 8 *; | [A]EP0500464 (FRAMATOME SA [FR]) [A] 1,5,7,11 * column W * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911011), vol. 015, no. 400, Database accession no. (M - 1167), & JP03163215 A 19910715 (EBARA RES CO LTD ET AL) [A] 1,5,7,11 * abstract * |