EP0702141 - Wall assembly for an exhaust gas nozzle of a supersonic jet engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/12] | Sound absorbing apparatus for a supersonic jet propelling engine | ||
[2001/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2003 [2003/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kishi, Kimihiro, c/o Nagoya Guidance & Propulsion System Works, Mitsubishi Jukogyo K.K., 1200, O-aza Higashi Tanaka, Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1996/12] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95113250.5 | 23.08.1995 | [1996/12] | Priority number, date | JP19940220067 | 14.09.1994 Original published format: JP 22006794 | [1996/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0702141 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0702141 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | [1998/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0702141 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F02K1/82, G10K11/16 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
G10K11/161 (EP,US);
F02K1/827 (EP,US);
F05D2260/96 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/12] | Title | German: | Wandaufbau für die Austrittsdüse eines Überschall-Strahltriebwerks | [2001/39] | English: | Wall assembly for an exhaust gas nozzle of a supersonic jet engine | [2001/39] | French: | Ensemble parois pour une tuyére de propulsion d'un moteur reacteur supersonique | [2001/39] |
Former [1996/12] | Schallabsorber für einen Überschall-Strahlantrieb | ||
Former [1996/12] | Sound absorbing apparatus for a supersonic jet propelling engine | ||
Former [1996/12] | Dispositif d'absorption de bruit pour un propulseur par jet supersonique | Examination procedure | 20.09.1995 | Examination requested [1996/12] | 05.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3507355 (LAWSON DALE W R) [X] 1-5 * figure 2 * * column 3, line 26 - line 64 *; | [X]FR2396868 (SNECMA [FR]) [X] 1-5 * figure - *; | [X]US5184455 (EWING JOSEPH H [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * figure - *; | [X]US4747543 (MADDEN WILLIAM M [US]) [X] 1-5 * figure 5 *; | [X]US3640357 (KITCHING ANTHONY GEORGE, et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1373063 (DASSAULT AVIONS) [X] 3,4 * figure - * * page 1, line 32 - line 57 * * page 2, line 14 - line 24 * |