EP0699666 - Heterocyclic substituted benzoylguanidine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [1996/10] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gericke, Rolf, Dr. Mozartstrasse 19 D-64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | 02 /
Dorsch, Dieter, Dr. Königsberger Strasse 171 D-64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE | 03 /
Baumgarth, Manfred, Dr. Sachsenstrasse 53 D-64297 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
Minck, Klaus-Otto, Dr. Büchestrasse 8 D-64372 Ober Ramstadt / DE | 05 /
Beier, Norbert, Dr. Georgenhäuser Strasse 19 D-64354 Reinheim / DE | [1996/10] | Application number, filing date | 95113307.3 | 24.08.1995 | [1996/10] | Priority number, date | DE19944430861 | 31.08.1994 Original published format: DE 4430861 | [1996/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0699666 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0699666 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/60, C07D213/56, C07D213/68, C07D295/155, C07D211/58, C07D211/42, C07D207/327, C07D235/18, C07D307/54, A61K31/415, A61K31/44 | [1996/10] | CPC: |
C07D295/155 (EP,US);
C07D213/68 (EP,KR,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D211/42 (EP,US);
C07D211/44 (KR);
C07D211/58 (EP,US);
C07D213/56 (EP,US);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1996/10] | Title | German: | Heterocyclyl-benzoylguanidine | [1996/10] | English: | Heterocyclic substituted benzoylguanidine | [1996/10] | French: | Hétérocyclyl-benzoylguanidines. | [1998/20] |
Former [1996/10] | Benzoylguanidines, heterocyclyques substitués | Examination procedure | 06.08.1996 | Examination requested [1996/40] | 12.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP0416499 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [DY] 1-8* column W *; | [Y]EP0556673 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * siehe Seite 6, Zeile 50 und Seite 7, Zeile 15, und Beispielen 8,12,15,18 *; | [Y]EP0556674 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [PXY]EP0640588 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [PX] 1,3-8 * siehe Beispiel 15 * * column W * [PY] 1-8; | [PXY]EP0667341 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1,3-8 * siehe Beispiel 10 * * the whole document * [PY] 1-8 | [A] - R. KRANZHÖFER, "Suppression of Neointimal Thickening and smooth muscle cell proliferation", CIRC. RES., vol. 73, no. 2, pages 264 - 268 [A] 1-8 |