EP0698576 - Ozonizer and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/09] | Ozonizer | ||
[2001/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | For:DE
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For:DE
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | |||
Former [1996/09] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For:DE
KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harada, Minoru 1-9-22-406, Inari, Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Shinjo, Ryoichi 1423-620, Futoo-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Tsujimura, Manabu 4-44-8, Sakeecho-dori, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Nakata, Rempei 310-222, Iwase Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Miyazaki, Kunihiro Kureare-heiwadai 208, 3-17-17, Heiwadai Nerima-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Kaji, Naruhiko 661-1-202, Kamigo-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1996/09] | Representative(s) | Nöth, Heinz Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/09] | Nöth, Heinz, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, Mozartstrasse 17 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 95113336.2 | 24.08.1995 | [1996/09] | Priority number, date | JP19940224150 | 24.08.1994 Original published format: JP 22415094 | [1996/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0698576 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0698576 | Date: | 01.05.1996 | [1996/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0698576 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C01B13/11 | [1996/09] | CPC: |
C01B13/11 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/09] | Title | German: | Ozonisator und seine Verwendung | [2001/39] | English: | Ozonizer and its use | [2001/39] | French: | Ozoniseur et son utilisation | [2001/39] |
Former [1996/09] | Ozonisator | ||
Former [1996/09] | Ozonizer | ||
Former [1996/09] | Ozoniseur | Examination procedure | 12.09.1996 | Examination requested [1996/46] | 25.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.04.2003 | IT | 23.04.2003 | NL | 23.04.2003 | GB | 24.08.2003 | [2008/05] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 23.04.2003 | |
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
GB | 24.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/45] | NL | 23.04.2003 | |
GB | 24.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | NL | 23.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06227802 ; | JPH03174301 [ ] (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [A]EP0567114 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 32 - page 5, line 42 * | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19911104), vol. 115, no. 18, Database accession no. 186288w [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 37, Database accession no. 94-299539, & JPH06227802 A 19940816 (NIPPON OZONE KK ET AL) [A] 1 * abstract * |