EP0701367 - Program guide interface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | Revocation of patent | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 10333 North Meridian Street Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/11] | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 10330 North Meridian St Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Newberry, Thomas Patrick 19145 Tomlinson Road Westfield IN 46074 / US | 02 /
Rodriguez-Cavazos, Enrique 13, Chemin de la Cote du Moulin F-78620 l'Etang la Ville / FR | 03 /
Saeger, Timothy William 8318 Nashua Drive Indianapolis IN 46260 / US | [1996/11] | Representative(s) | Arnold, Klaus-Peter, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | Arnold, Klaus-Peter, et al Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2011/13] | Kohrs, Martin, et al Technicolor 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | ||
Former [2011/13] | Kohrs, Martin, et al Thomson 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2000/15] | Kohrs, Martin, et al Thomson multimedia 46, quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1996/11] | Wördemann, Hermes, Dipl.-Ing., et al Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Patent Dept., Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 95113438.6 | 26.08.1995 | [1996/11] | Priority number, date | GB19940018173 | 09.09.1994 Original published format: GB 9418173 | US19940362649 | 21.12.1994 Original published format: US 362649 | [1996/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0701367 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0701367 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | [1996/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0701367 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/46 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
H04N7/0884 (EP);
H04N7/08 (KR);
H04N21/426 (EP);
H04N21/42638 (EP);
H04N21/42653 (EP);
H04N21/4345 (EP);
H04N21/435 (EP);
H04N21/47 (EP);
H04N21/482 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1996/13] | H04N5/445, H04N5/46 | ||
Former IPC [1996/11] | H04N5/445 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/11] | Title | German: | Schnittstelle für eine Programmführung | [1996/11] | English: | Program guide interface | [1996/11] | French: | Interface pour guide de programme | [1996/11] | Examination procedure | 06.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 06.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.02.2001
20.03.2001
ADMISSIBLE IGR GmbH & Co. KG. Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Leibnizstrasse 6 95447 Bayreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.02.2001
20.03.2001
ADMISSIBLE IGR GmbH & Co. KG. Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | ||
Former [2001/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.02.2001
Interessengemeinschaft für Rundfunkschutzrechte GmbH Schutzrechtsverwertung & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 62 40210 Düsseldorf / DE Opponent's representative Eichstädt, Alfred, Dipl.-Ing. Maryniok & Partner, Kuhbergstrasse 23 96317 Kronach / DE | 23.03.2001 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.09.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.09.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.01.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 02.03.2011 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/21] | Appeal following opposition | 12.03.2007 | Appeal received No. T0419/07 | 22.05.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.03.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 02.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.03.2011 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.11.1996 | M01   Fee paid on   06.12.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0574273 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) | [A] - BRUGLIERA V, "DIGITAL ON-SCREEN DISPLAY A NEW TECHNOLOGY FOR THE CONSUMER INTERFACE", CABLE TV SESSIONS, MONTREUX, JUNE 10 - 15, 1993, POSTES;TELEPHONES ET TELEGRAPHES SUISSES, (19930611), no. SYMP. 18, pages 571 - 586, XP000379382 [A] 1,4,5,12,16 * the whole document * | [A] - GILLIES D ET AL, "COMBINED TV FORMAT CONTROL AND SAMPLING RATE CONVERSION IC", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, (19940801), vol. 40, no. 3, pages 711 - 716, XP000471240 [A] 1,12,16 * page 713; figure 2 * | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Programmable Receiver for Multi-Media System", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, ARMONK (US), vol. 36, no. 11, pages 125 - 126, XP000424803 [A] 1,12,16 * the whole document * |